Original Case: 5:21-cv-00464

Eleventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-prici-11480
Typeprivate civil / federal question
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 01, 2025 4:18 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
GEORGIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Represented By
Christopher Michael Carr
Georgia Department of Law
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
JUSTIN LASTER
Represented By
Justin Laster
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 4:18 AM EDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Justin Laster on 11/22/2024. Fee Status: IFP Granted. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/19/2025 as to Appellant Justin Laster. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/28/2025 as to Appellee Georgia Department of Corrections.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs CIVIL - Notice of Docketing
Att: 2 3 pgs Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal
Att: 3 1 pgs USDC Judgment DE# 53
Att: 4 34 pgs USDC Judgment DE# 52