Original Case: 2:22-cv-00111

Sixth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cv-05396
Typecivil / private / civil rights - title vii
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 01, 2025 3:36 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
SUMMIT MEDICAL GROUP, INC., dba St. Elizabeth Physicians
Represented By
Michael Joseph Enzweiler
Dressman Benzinger LaVelle
contact info
Mark David Guilfoyle
Dressman Benzinger LaVelle
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ST. ELIZABETH MEDICAL CENTER, INC., dba St. Elizabeth Healthcare
Represented By
Michael Joseph Enzweiler
Dressman Benzinger LaVelle
contact info
Mark David Guilfoyle
Dressman Benzinger LaVelle
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
DR. ROBERT PRICHARD
Represented By
Michael Joseph Enzweiler
Dressman Benzinger LaVelle
contact info
Mark David Guilfoyle
Dressman Benzinger LaVelle
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
GARREN COLVIN
Represented By
Michael Joseph Enzweiler
Dressman Benzinger LaVelle
contact info
Mark David Guilfoyle
Dressman Benzinger LaVelle
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
DR. AMY DICHIARA
Represented By
Thomas Bernard Bruns
Bruns, Connell, Vollmar & Armstrong
contact info
Christopher David Wiest
Law Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 3:36 AM CDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
The case manager for this case is: Robin L. Baker (RLB)
Related: [-]
3 pgs Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Amy Dichiara. Transcript needed: y. (RLB)
Related: [-]
1 pgs APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Amy Dichiara by Thomas B Bruns. Certificate of Service: 04/30/2025. 25-5396 (TBB)
Related: [-]