Original Case: 2:23-cv-00404

Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cv-01737
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 01, 2025 7:11 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
PAIGE N. HICKENBOTTOM
Represented By
Matthew S. Clark
CLARK JOHNSON & KNIGHT, LTD.
contact info
Joseph William Smith
CLARK JOHNSON & KNIGHT, LTD.
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
SAMUEL A. JACOBS
Represented By
Matthew S. Clark
CLARK JOHNSON & KNIGHT, LTD.
contact info
Joseph William Smith
CLARK JOHNSON & KNIGHT, LTD.
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JARRETT A. STICKLE
Represented By
Matthew S. Clark
CLARK JOHNSON & KNIGHT, LTD.
contact info
Joseph William Smith
CLARK JOHNSON & KNIGHT, LTD.
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
TOWN OF ST. JOHN, INDIANA
Represented By
Matthew S. Clark
CLARK JOHNSON & KNIGHT, LTD.
contact info
Joseph William Smith
CLARK JOHNSON & KNIGHT, LTD.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
JACQUELINE J. AGEE
Represented By
Jeffrey R. Kulwin
KULWIN, MASCIOPINTO & KULWIN, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
JOHN J. AGEE, originally a minor filed by and through his legal guardian JACQUELINE J. AGEE
Represented By
Jeffrey R. Kulwin
KULWIN, MASCIOPINTO & KULWIN, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 3:19 AM CDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
1 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellants Jacqueline J. Agee and John J. Agee by 05/06/2025. Transcript information sheet due by 05/14/2025. Appellants' brief due on or before 06/09/2025 for Jacqueline J. Agee and John J. Agee. [1] [7449604] 25-1737 (PS) [Entered: 04/30/2025 12:01 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 29 pgs Civil Case
Att: 2 2 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice to District Court