Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Kathleen M Williams
Referred: Ch Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman
Case #: 1:25-cv-22006
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:0101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:May 01, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 01, 2025 11:07 AM EDT
Defendant
John Doe
Plaintiff
Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Christian W Waugh
Waugh PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 02, 2025
6 6 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Fri 05/02 10:47 AM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 5/2/2025. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
5 5 5 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 05/01 3:55 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Ch. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 5/1/2025. See attached document for full details. (ar24)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 05/01 3:28 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC. for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Waugh, Christian)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Form AO 120/121 Thu 05/01 11:26 AM
FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (ar24)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Thu 05/01 11:22 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (ar24)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 05/01 10:56 AM
COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against John Doe. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18414092, filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Waugh, Christian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Infringement Log