South Carolina District Court
Judge:Jacquelyn D Austin
Case #: 8:25-cv-03610
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 01, 2025 11:07 AM EDT
Defendant
Equifax Information Services LLC
Plaintiff
Blake Nicholas Bouknight
Represented By
Penny Hays Cauley
Hays Cauley PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 05/06 4:01 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE by Blake Nicholas Bouknight. Equifax Information Services LLC waiver executed on 5/1/2025, answer due 6/30/2025. (Cauley, Penny)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 05/01 10:17 AM
Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services LLC. (alma, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
3 3 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Thu 05/01 10:16 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Blake Nicholas Bouknight. (alma, ) Modified on 5/1/2025 to correct date filed (alma, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 05/01 10:15 AM
COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-12425327.), filed by Blake Nicholas Bouknight. Service due by 7/29/2025. (alma, )
Related: [-]