Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Rodney Gilstrap
Referred: Roy S Payne
Case #: 2:25-cv-00455
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:May 01, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 01, 2025 10:06 AM CDT
Defendant
Panda Express, Inc.
Defendant
Panda Restaurant Group, Inc.
Plaintiff
Nearby Systems LLC
Represented By
Jonathan Lloyd Hardt
Rozier Hardt Mcdonough PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 05/07 1:41 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nearby Systems LLC. Panda Express, Inc. served on 5/5/2025. (Hardt, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 05/05 3:01 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Francis McDonough, III on behalf of Nearby Systems LLC (McDonough, James)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 05/05 2:59 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Carey Matthew Rozier on behalf of Nearby Systems LLC (Rozier, Carey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 05/01 4:18 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to Panda Express, Inc.. (mdj)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 05/01 4:15 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to Panda Restaurant Group, Inc.. (mdj)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Thu 05/01 9:55 AM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hardt, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Thu 05/01 9:53 AM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Nearby Systems LLC (Hardt, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
1 1 21 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 05/01 9:52 AM
COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10814579.), filed by Nearby Systems LLC.(Hardt, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A. U.S. Patent No. 9,532,164,
Att: 2 Exhibit B. U.S. Patent No. 10,469,980,
Att: 3 Exhibit C. U.S. Patent No. 11,937,145,
Att: 4 Exhibit D. U.S. Patent No. 12,185,177,
Att: 5 Exhibit E. Webpage: Panda Express App Available at the App Store,
Att: 6 Exhibit F. Webpage: Panda Express Available at Google Play,
Att: 7 Exhibit G. Webpage: Panda Express App,
Att: 8 Exhibit H. Exemplary Evidence of Use Regarding Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 9,532,164,
Att: 9 Exhibit I. Exemplary Evidence of Use Regarding Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 10,469,980,
Att: 10 Exhibit J. Exemplary Evidence of Use Regarding Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 11,937,145,
Att: 11 Exhibit K. Exemplary Evidence of Use Regarding Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 12,185,177,
Att: 12 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 13 Additional Attachment(s) Proposed Summons,
Att: 14 Additional Attachment(s) Proposed Summons
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 05/01 3:22 PM
District Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne added. (mdj)
Related: [-]