Maryland District Court
Judge:Stephanie A Gallagher
Case #: 1:25-cv-01384
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e-2 Job Discrimination
Case Filed:May 01, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 01, 2025 12:07 PM EDT
Defendant
Dreyer's Grand Ice Cream
Plaintiff
Arielle Mbarga Ndzie
9535 Sylvan Still Rd. #E
Laurel, MD 20723


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
5 5 misc Supplement Fri 05/09 10:42 AM
Supplement to1 Complaint filed by Arielle Mbarga Ndzie(bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment,
Att: 2 Envelope
Friday, May 02, 2025
4 4 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 05/02 4:32 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Arielle Mbarga Ndzie(bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Thursday, May 01, 2025
3 3 notice Deficiency Notice-Non-Prisoner Thu 05/01 12:08 PM
Deficiency Notice for Arielle Mbarga Ndzie re: (ECF No.1 Complaint filed by Arielle Mbarga Ndzie ); must be corrected by 5/15/2025 (c/m w/ forms 05/01/2025 - bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc New Case Notification Letter Thu 05/01 12:06 PM
New Case Notification Letter sent to Arielle Mbarga Ndzie. (c/m 05/01/2025 - bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 05/01 12:00 PM
COMPLAINT against Dreyer's Grand Ice Cream, filed by Arielle Mbarga Ndzie.(bw5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment,
Att: 2 Envelope