Tennessee Western District Court
Judge:Sheryl H Lipman
Referred: Annie T Christoff
Case #: 2:25-cv-02475
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:May 01, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 01, 2025 11:08 AM CDT
Defendant
Highgate Hotels LLP
Plaintiff
Jessica Dendy
2411 Carrol Ridge Lane
Cordova, TN 38016


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
10 10 service Summons Issued Tue 05/06 9:43 AM
Summons Issued as to Highgate Hotels LLP. Summons (2), USM 285, complaint and Order placed in USM's inneroffice mail for service. (jae)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
8 8 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 05/05 5:34 PM
ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND ORDER TO ISSUE AND EFFECT SERVICE OF PROCESS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff on 05/05/2025. (jad)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
7 7 notice Notice LR 72.1 - Right to Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge Thu 05/01 10:44 AM
NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form (form AO 85) is available on the US Courts website at https://www.uscourts.gov/forms-rules/forms. (mf)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice LR 16.2 Thu 05/01 10:44 AM
NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (mf)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice ADR Compliance Thu 05/01 10:44 AM
NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (mf)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 05/01 10:43 AM
Pro Se MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jessica Dendy. (mf)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Thu 05/01 10:38 AM
NOTICE of signed agreement to receive NEFs by Jessica Dendy (mf)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Pro Se Complaint Thu 05/01 10:33 AM
PRO SE COMPLAINT against Highgate Hotels LLP, filed by Jessica Dendy.(mf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 EEOC letter,
Att: 2 Exhibit
1 1 utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 05/01 10:31 AM
Chief Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff added. (mf)
Related: [-]