Montana District Court
Judge:Dana L Christensen
Case #: 9:25-cv-00064
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:May 01, 2025
Terminated:May 05, 2025
Interested Party
NEF-MSP
Petitioner
Tracey Godfrey

GPO May 05 2025
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. COA denied. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 5/5/2025. Transmitted electronically to prison for delivery to inmate. (TAG)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Monday, May 05, 2025
3 3 misc Judgment - Clerk Mon 05/05 2:25 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Transmitted electronically to prison for delivery to inmate. (TAG)
Related: [-]
2 2 4 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 05/05 2:22 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. COA denied. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 5/5/2025. Transmitted electronically to prison for delivery to inmate. (TAG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - SDM Thu 05/01 9:11 AM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5 not paid), filed by Tracey Godfrey. (TAG)
Related: [-]