New York Southern District Court
Judge:Ronnie Abrams
Case #: 1:25-cv-03642
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause29:160j Labor: Petition for Inj - Relief from Unfair Labor Practice
Case Filed:May 01, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 01, 2025 1:07 PM EDT
Petitioner
John D Doyle, Jr.
Region 2 of the National Labor Relations Board 26 Federal Plaza, Room 41-120
New York, NY 10278
Respondent
Covenant House New York
460 W 41st Street
New York, NY 10036


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
11 11 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 05/05 12:24 PM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Jacob Frisch to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Ronnie Abrams)(Text Only Order) (arc)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
10 10 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 05/02 11:25 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Frisch, Jacob)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Fri 05/02 10:57 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 05/02 10:58 AM
Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 05/02 10:58 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Fri 05/02 11:00 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jacob B. Frisch. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jurisdiction code 3 (Federal Question);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jurisdiction code has been modified to 1 (U.S. Government Plaintiff);. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Fri 05/02 11:01 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jacob B. Frisch. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: John D Doyle, Jr., Covenant House New York. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was omitted;. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet Fri 05/02 11:01 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Jacob B. Frisch to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Petition (Other),,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated December 4, 2024; the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated December 4, 2024. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated December 4, 2024 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-cover-sheet-2.. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Court Regarding Proposed Order Fri 05/02 12:15 PM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITHOUT EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document No. 7 Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief was reviewed and approved as to form. (tp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/01 3:50 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Allen Michael Rose on behalf of John D Doyle, Jr...(Rose, Allen)
Related: [-]
8 8 30+ pgs respoth Memorandum of Law in Support (non-motion) Thu 05/01 2:29 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:1 Petition (Other),, . Document filed by John D Doyle, Jr...(Frisch, Jacob)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief Thu 05/01 2:06 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITHOUT EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document filed by John D Doyle, Jr.. Related Document Number:1 ..(Frisch, Jacob)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/01 1:42 PM
MOTION for Jacob Frisch to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by John D Doyle, Jr...(Frisch, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Cert of Good standing,
Att: 2 Affidavit affidavit,
Att: 3 Proposed Order proposed order
5 5 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/01 1:40 PM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE 6 motion) - MOTION for Jacob Frisch to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by John D Doyle, Jr..(Frisch, Jacob) Modified on 5/1/2025 (db)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit PHV affidavit,
Att: 2 Proposed Order PHV order
4 4 misc Trial Memorandum Thu 05/01 1:36 PM
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU (SEE 8 Memorandum) - TRIAL MEMORANDUM. Document filed by John D Doyle, Jr. (Frisch, Jacob) Modified on 5/1/2025 (db)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Preliminary Injunction Thu 05/01 1:29 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to Try on Basis of Adminstrative Record . Document filed by John D Doyle, Jr...(Frisch, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex A Transcript,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex B(i) GC Exhibits,
Att: 3 Exhibit EX B(ii) Respondent Exhibits,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex B(iii) Joint Exhibits
2 2 motion File Excess Pages Thu 05/01 1:23 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages . Document filed by John D Doyle, Jr...(Frisch, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order order granting exceed word limit
1 1 cmp Petition (Other) Thu 05/01 1:15 PM
PETITION FOR INJUNCTION UNDER SECTION 10(J) OF THE NLRA..Document filed by John D Doyle, Jr...(Frisch, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex A Charge,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex B Amended Charge,
Att: 3 14 pgs Exhibit Ex C Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex D Amended Complaint,
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex E Answer,
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex F First Amended Answer,
Att: 7 Exhibit Ex G Second Amended Answer,
Att: 8 Exhibit Ex H Notice of intent to amend,
Att: 9 Proposed Order proposed order,
Att: 10 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet,
Att: 11 Proposed Order order to show cause,
Att: 12 Affidavit RD declaration
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Thu 05/01 3:13 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 6 MOTION for Jacob Frisch to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bc)
Related: [-]