Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-10585

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:J Kate Stickles
Case #: 1:25-ap-50675
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
CPT Arlington Highlands 1, LP
PO Box 206250
Dallas, TX 75320
Represented By
CPT Arlington Highlands 1, LP
contact info
Plaintiff
Don A. Beskrone, Chapter 7 Trustee for JC USA, Inc.
500 Delaware Avenue 8th Floor
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Benjamin W. Keenan
Ashby & Geddes
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
4 4 crditcrd none Wed 04/30 3:43 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 25-50675 JKS] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number Deferred, amount $ 350.00. (Hollis)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Exhibit Wed 04/30 3:37 PM
Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 548 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 Filed by Don A. Beskrone, Chapter 7 Trustee for JC USA, Inc., et al. (Keenan, Benjamin)Modified on 5/1/2025 (GNP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
2 2 notice Withdrawal - Notice Wed 04/30 3:36 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 548 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 Related [+] Filed by Don A. Beskrone, Chapter 7 Trustee for JC USA, Inc., et al (Keenan, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 1
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 04/30 1:47 PM
"Withdrawn on 4/30/2025...see docket2 . See docket3 for the complaint." Adversary case 25-50675 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 548 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by Don A. Beskrone, Chapter 7 Trustee for JC USA, Inc., et al against CPT Arlington Highlands 1, LP. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)). AP Summons Served due date: 7/29/2025. (Keenan, Benjamin)Modified on 5/1/2025 (GNP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A