Delaware District Court
Judge:Jennifer L Hall
Case #: 1:25-cv-00530
Nature of Suit835 Property Rights - Patent – Abbreviated New Drug Application
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:May 01, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 01, 2025 2:05 PM EDT
Defendant
DifGen Pharmaceuticals LLC
Plaintiff
Aurinia Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By
Maliheh Zare
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
Alexandra M. Joyce
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
Daniel M. Silver
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 05/07 9:33 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Jennifer L. Hall. Please include the initials of the Judge (JLH) after the case number on all documents filed. (alb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
6 6 service Summons Issued Thu 05/01 1:46 PM
Summons Issued as to DifGen Pharmaceuticals LLC on 5/1/2025. (scs)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1 Thu 05/01 1:44 PM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Aurinia Pharmaceuticals Inc. (scs)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents Thu 05/01 1:43 PM
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 10,286,036; 11,622,991. (scs)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc ANDA Form Thu 05/01 1:42 PM
Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: March 18, 2025. Date of Expiration of Patent: December 7, 2037. Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 9/18/2027. (scs)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Magistrate Consent Forms Thu 05/01 1:40 PM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (scs)
Related: [-]
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 05/01 1:39 PM
COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against DifGen Pharmaceuticals LLC (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ADEDC-4676008) - filed by Aurinia Pharmaceuticals Inc..(scs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits 1-2,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet