Alabama Middle District Court
Judge:Myron H Thompson
Referred: Chad W Bryan
Case #: 2:25-cv-00327
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:May 01, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 01, 2025 2:07 PM CDT
Defendant
Kristina Rose
Plaintiff
Roger James Zorn, Sr.
1927 Highway 177
Bonifay, FL 32425


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
7 7 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 05/05 12:59 PM
ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The clerk of court thus is DIRECTED to defer service of process pending the court's threshold § 1915(e) review. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chad W. Bryan on 5/5/2025. (c/s) (LAB)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 05/05 9:05 AM
ORDERED that, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636, this case is referred to the United States Magistrate Judge for consideration and disposition or recommendation on all pretrial matters as may be appropriate. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 5/5/2025. (c/s) (LAB)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
5 5 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 05/02 4:17 PM
Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson and Magistrate Judge Chad W. Bryan. Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr., Magistrate Judge Kelly F. Pate no longer assigned to the case. (LAB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Thu 05/01 4:36 PM
NOTICE to Pro Se Party re Service Material. (BES)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Deficiency Corporate Disc/Conflict Statement Thu 05/01 4:35 PM
Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to (PLF) Roger James Zorn, Sr.; Corporate Disclosures due by 5/12/2025.(BES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Standing Order and Sample Format
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 05/01 4:34 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Roger James Zorn, Sr.(BES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Application IFP
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 05/01 4:34 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Kristina Rose, filed by Roger James Zorn, Sr.(BES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supporting Documents