Alabama Middle District Court
Judge:Myron H Thompson
Referred: Chad W Bryan
Case #: 2:25-cv-00330
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:May 01, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 01, 2025 2:08 PM CDT
Defendant
Pamela Bondi
Plaintiff
Roger James Zorn, Sr.
1927 Highway 177
Bonifay, FL 32425


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
7 7 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 05/06 4:08 PM
ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The clerk of court thus is DIRECTED to defer service of process pending the court's threshold § 1915(e) review. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chad W. Bryan on 5/6/2025. (c/s) (LAB)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Tue 05/06 8:49 AM
NOTICE re Service Material as to1 Complaint. (c/s by intake) (LAB)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Deficiency Corporate Disc/Conflict Statement Tue 05/06 8:47 AM
Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Roger James Zorn, Sr. Corporate Disclosures due by 5/16/2025. (c/s) (LAB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Standing Order and Sample Format
Monday, May 05, 2025
2 2 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 05/05 4:40 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Roger James Zorn, Sr. (LAB)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
1 1 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 05/02 3:58 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY demand against Pamela Bondi, filed by Roger James Zorn, Sr. (LAB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
Att: 1 IFP Application
Att: 1 Exhibit