Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Kathleen M Williams
Referred: Jonathan Goodman
Case #: 1:25-cv-22015
Nature of Suit340 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine
Cause28:1332 Diversity
Case Filed:May 01, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 01, 2025 3:07 PM EDT
Defendant
ROYAL CARIBBEAN CRUISES, LTD.
Plaintiff
DONNA STEPHENS
Represented By
Jacqueline Garcell
Lipcon, Margulies, Alsina, Winkleman, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 02, 2025
5 5 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Fri 05/02 10:41 AM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 5/2/2025. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
4 4 5 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other Thu 05/01 4:32 PM
ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. REFERRING CASE to Ch. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for all Discovery Disputes and for Non-Dispositive Pretrial Motions. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 5/1/2025. See attached document for full details. (jas)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 05/01 2:47 PM
Summons Issued as to ROYAL CARIBBEAN CRUISES, LTD.. (blc)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Thu 05/01 2:42 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (blc)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 05/01 2:04 PM
COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against ROYAL CARIBBEAN CRUISES, LTD.. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18415244, filed by DONNA STEPHENS.(Garcell, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s)