New York Southern District Court
Judge:Mary Kay Vyskocil
Case #: 1:25-cv-03655
Nature of Suit896 Other Statutes - Arbitration
Cause9:9 Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award
Case Filed:May 01, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 01, 2025 3:07 PM EDT
Petitioner
Curtis McGhee
Represented By
Jacob Royal Zissu
Clausen Miller P.C.
contact info
Petitioner
Kim Wohlhueter
Represented By
Jacob Royal Zissu
Clausen Miller P.C.
contact info
Petitioner
Philip Whitmore
Represented By
Jacob Royal Zissu
Clausen Miller P.C.
contact info
Petitioner
Robert Welenofsky
Represented By
Jacob Royal Zissu
Clausen Miller P.C.
contact info
Petitioner
Kelly Theriault
Represented By
Jacob Royal Zissu
Clausen Miller P.C.
contact info
Petitioner
Charles Timothy Sweeney
Represented By
Jacob Royal Zissu
Clausen Miller P.C.
contact info
Petitioner
Patrick Sellenraad
Represented By
Jacob Royal Zissu
Clausen Miller P.C.
contact info
Petitioner
Robert C. Gregg and Christine L. Gregg Trust
Represented By
Jacob Royal Zissu
Clausen Miller P.C.
contact info
Petitioner
Raphael Ospina
Represented By
Jacob Royal Zissu
Clausen Miller P.C.
contact info
Petitioner
Banman Lippelmann, LLC
Represented By
Jacob Royal Zissu
Clausen Miller P.C.
contact info
Petitioner
Tony Kawaguchi
Represented By
Jacob Royal Zissu
Clausen Miller P.C.
contact info
Petitioner
Luke Hofacker
Represented By
Jacob Royal Zissu
Clausen Miller P.C.
contact info
Petitioner
Matthew Gwaltney
Represented By
Jacob Royal Zissu
Clausen Miller P.C.
contact info
Petitioner
Rajinikanth Gurusankarnath
Represented By
Jacob Royal Zissu
Clausen Miller P.C.
contact info
Petitioner
Jerry Davis
Represented By
Jacob Royal Zissu
Clausen Miller P.C.
contact info
Petitioner
Cottonwood Resources, LLC
Represented By
Jacob Royal Zissu
Clausen Miller P.C.
contact info
Respondent
Lippelmann Partners, LLC
Respondent
Jason Gilbert


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
16 16 motion Leave to File Document Wed 05/07 5:28 PM
LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit(s) to Amended Petition addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Jacob R. Zissu dated May 7, 2025. Document filed by Banman Lippelmann, LLC, Cottonwood Resources, LLC, Jerry Davis, Rajinikanth Gurusankarnath, Matthew Gwaltney, Luke Hofacker, Tony Kawaguchi, Curtis McGhee, Raphael Ospina, Robert C. Gregg and Christine L. Gregg Trust, Patrick Sellenraad, Charles Timothy Sweeney, Kelly Theriault, Robert Welenofsky, Philip Whitmore, Kim Wohlhueter..(Zissu, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit ECF Doc. No. 1 - Petition,
Att: 2 Exhibit ECF Doc. No. 1-1 Exhibit A to Petition,
Att: 3 Exhibit ECF Doc. No. 1-2 Exhibit B to Petition,
Att: 4 Exhibit ECF Doc. No. 1-3 Exhibit C to Petition,
Att: 5 Exhibit ECF Doc. No. 12 Amended Petition,
Att: 6 Exhibit ECF Doc. No. 13 Cover Sheet for Amended Petition Exhibits,
Att: 7 Exhibit ECF Doc. No. 13-1 Exhibit A to Amended Petition,
Att: 8 Exhibit ECF Doc. No. 13-2 Exhibit B to Amended Petition,
Att: 9 Exhibit ECF Doc. No. 13-3 Exhibit C to Amended Petition,
Att: 10 Exhibit Redlined Amended Petition
15 15 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 05/07 9:36 AM
ORDER granting14 Motion for Kurt A. Harper to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil)(Text Only Order) (rz)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Wed 05/07 3:42 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jacob Royal Zissu re: Document No. 13 Exhibit to Pleading. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Court's leave has not been granted; the order granting permission to file the pleading was not attached. File the Exhibit to Pleading event found under the event list Other Documents and attach either opposing party's written consent or Court's leave. (vf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
14 14 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 05/06 12:19 PM
MOTION for Kurt A. Harper to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-31037730. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Banman Lippelmann, LLC, Cottonwood Resources, LLC, Jerry Davis, Rajinikanth Gurusankarnath, Matthew Gwaltney, Luke Hofacker, Tony Kawaguchi, Curtis McGhee, Raphael Ospina, Robert C. Gregg and Christine L. Gregg Trust, Patrick Sellenraad, Charles Timothy Sweeney, Kelly Theriault, Robert Welenofsky, Philip Whitmore, Kim Wohlhueter..(Harper, Kurt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice
13 13 misc Exhibit to Pleading Tue 05/06 10:21 AM
EXHIBIT TO PLEADING re:12 Amended Petition,,. Document filed by Banman Lippelmann, LLC, Cottonwood Resources, LLC, Jerry Davis, Rajinikanth Gurusankarnath, Matthew Gwaltney, Luke Hofacker, Tony Kawaguchi, Curtis McGhee, Raphael Ospina, Robert C. Gregg and Christine L. Gregg Trust, Patrick Sellenraad, Charles Timothy Sweeney, Kelly Theriault, Robert Welenofsky, Philip Whitmore, Kim Wohlhueter..(Zissu, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Third Amended and Restated Operating Agreement of Lippelmann Partners, LLC,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Partial Award of Arbitrator,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Final Award of Arbitrator
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Tue 05/06 12:42 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 14 MOTION for Kurt A. Harper to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-31037730. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (rju)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
12 12 cmp Amended Petition Fri 05/02 3:34 PM
AMENDED PETITION amending1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,, against Jason Gilbert, Lippelmann Partners, LLC.Document filed by Patrick Sellenraad, Raphael Ospina, Curtis McGhee, Banman Lippelmann, LLC, Kim Wohlhueter, Kelly Theriault, Rajinikanth Gurusankarnath, Jerry Davis, Robert C. Gregg and Christine L. Gregg Trust, Charles Timothy Sweeney, Cottonwood Resources, LLC, Matthew Gwaltney, Tony Kawaguchi, Luke Hofacker, Robert Welenofsky, Philip Whitmore. Related document:1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,,..(Zissu, Jacob)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 05/02 3:15 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Zissu, Jacob)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Issued Fri 05/02 3:05 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lippelmann Partners, LLC..(pc)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Issued Fri 05/02 3:04 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jason Gilbert..(pc)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Fri 05/02 2:36 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 05/02 2:45 PM
Magistrate Judge Gary Stein is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 05/02 2:46 PM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Fri 05/02 2:46 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jacob Royal Zissu. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Kim Wohlhueter. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party type was entered incorrectly;. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet Fri 05/02 2:46 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Jacob Royal Zissu to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): civil cover sheet was not signed;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Related Case Statement Fri 05/02 2:46 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to attorney Jacob Royal Zissu to Document No. 6 Statement of Relatedness,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the related case statement is not correct; the related case statement was not signed; Related Case is not from the Southern District of New York. (pc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
8 8 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 05/01 4:00 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to LIPPELMANN PARTNERS, LLC, re:1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,,. Document filed by Banman Lippelmann, LLC, Cottonwood Resources, LLC, Jerry Davis, Rajinikanth Gurusankarnath, Matthew Gwaltney, Luke Hofacker, Tony Kawaguchi, Curtis McGhee, Raphael Ospina, Robert C. Gregg and Christine L. Gregg Trust, Patrick Sellenraad, Charles Timothy Sweeney, Kelly Theriault, Robert Welenofsky, Philip Whitmore, Kim Wohlhueter..(Zissu, Jacob)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 05/01 3:59 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jason Gilbert, re:1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,,. Document filed by Banman Lippelmann, LLC, Cottonwood Resources, LLC, Jerry Davis, Rajinikanth Gurusankarnath, Matthew Gwaltney, Luke Hofacker, Tony Kawaguchi, Curtis McGhee, Raphael Ospina, Robert C. Gregg and Christine L. Gregg Trust, Patrick Sellenraad, Charles Timothy Sweeney, Kelly Theriault, Robert Welenofsky, Philip Whitmore, Kim Wohlhueter..(Zissu, Jacob)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Statement of Relatedness Thu 05/01 3:50 PM
FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 22cv1057 (D.Kan.). Document filed by Banman Lippelmann, LLC, Cottonwood Resources, LLC, Jerry Davis, Rajinikanth Gurusankarnath, Matthew Gwaltney, Luke Hofacker, Tony Kawaguchi, Curtis McGhee, Raphael Ospina, Robert C. Gregg and Christine L. Gregg Trust, Patrick Sellenraad, Charles Timothy Sweeney, Kelly Theriault, Robert Welenofsky, Philip Whitmore, Kim Wohlhueter..(Zissu, Jacob) Modified on 5/2/2025 (pc)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 05/01 3:38 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Robert C. Gregg and Christine L. Gregg Trust..(Zissu, Jacob)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 05/01 3:37 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Cottonwood Resources, LLC..(Zissu, Jacob)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 05/01 3:35 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Banman Lippelmann, LLC..(Zissu, Jacob)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 05/01 3:34 PM
FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Zissu, Jacob) Modified on 5/2/2025 (pc)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs cmp Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration Thu 05/01 3:01 PM
PETITION TO Confirm / Enforce ARBITRATION. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-31017152).Document filed by Patrick Sellenraad, Raphael Ospina, Curtis McGhee, Jason Gilbert, Banman Lippelmann, LLC, Kim Wohlhueter, Kelly Theriault, Lippelmann Partners, LLC, Rajinikanth Gurusankarnath, Jerry Davis, Robert C. Gregg and Christine L. Gregg Trust, Charles Timothy Sweeney, Cottonwood Resources, LLC, Matthew Gwaltney, Tony Kawaguchi, Luke Hofacker, Robert Welenofsky, Philip Whitmore..(Zissu, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 39 pgs Exhibit A - Third Amended and Restated Operating Agreement of Lippelmann Partners, LLC,
Att: 2 19 pgs Exhibit B - Partial Award of Arbitrator,
Att: 3 4 pgs Exhibit C - Final Award of Arbitrator