Wilson v. U.S. Bank et al
Connecticut District Court | |
Judge: | Omar A Williams |
Case #: | 3:25-cv-00696 |
Nature of Suit | 371 Torts - Personal Property - Truth in Lending |
Cause | No cause code entered |
Case Filed: | May 01, 2025 |
Last checked: Thursday May 01, 2025 4:07 PM EDT |
Defendant
Gerardo J Tirado
|
|
Defendant
U.S. Bank
|
|
Plaintiff
Clayton Samuel Wilson
111 Grandview Ave.
Bridgeport, CT 06606 |
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Thursday, May 08, 2025 | ||
10 | 10
![]() AMENDED COMPLAINT against U.S. Bank, filed by Clayton Samuel Wilson.(Kelsey, N) |
|
Monday, May 05, 2025 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 05/05 12:50 PM
ORDER denying ECF No.2 , Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; dismissing case. Under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2), courts are required to dismiss any action that is frivolous or that fails to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. See also Fitzgerald v. First E. Seventh St. Tenants Corp. , 221 F.3d 362, 364 (2d Cir. 2000) ("[W]e hold that district courts may dismiss a frivolous complaint sua sponte even when the plaintiff has paid the required filing fee...."). Plaintiff purports to sue U.S. Bank and an employee thereof for violating the Equal Credit Opportunity Act ("ECOA"), 15 U.S.C. § 1691et seq. He states that he applied for credit at the bank and was denied, which denial he believes must have resulted from some misconduct. While the ECOA does prohibit lenders from denying credit to applicants based upon a protected characteristic, Plaintiff has failed to adduce sufficient facts to support any such claim. He does not state to which protected group he belongs or that the bank indicated any preference for applicants not of that protected group. And while he speaks generally of his creditworthiness, it is not clear that he was in fact qualified for the loan he sought. Accordingly, the ECOA claim must be dismissed, though without prejudice. Plaintiff may amend his complaint on or before June 16, 2025. Failure to do so will result in closure of this action. Should Plaintiff choose to amend the complaint, the court draws his attention to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, which lay out certain requirements for pleadings. For example, Rule 10 requires a pleading to have a Rule 7(a) designation and numbered paragraphs, and Rule 11 requires it to include the pleader's address, email address, and phone number. Any amended complaint must comply with all the Rules. The court will not accept another letter-form pleading. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 5/5/25. (Wagner, R) |
|
Thursday, May 01, 2025 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Standing Order re: Letters. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 05/01/2025. (Kelsey, N) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Kelsey, N) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 05/01/2025. (Kelsey, N) |
|
5 | 5
![]() ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 05/01/2025. (Kelsey, N) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/30/2025; Discovery due by 10/31/2025; Dispositive Motions due by 12/5/2025, Signed by Clerk on 05/01/2025. (Kelsey, N) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice re: Disclosure Statement
Thu 05/01 3:44 PM
Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1(b), a disclosure statement required under Rule 7.1(a) must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 5/1/2025. (Oliver, T.) |
|
2 | 2
![]() MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Clayton Samuel Wilson. (Oliver, T.) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Gerardo J Tirado, U.S. Bank, filed by Clayton Samuel Wilson. (Oliver, T.) |
|
utility
NEW Case Assignment
Thu 05/01 3:47 PM
CASE ASSIGNMENT: District Judge Omar A. Williams assigned to the case. If the District Judge issues an Order of Referral to a Magistrate Judge for any matter other than settlement, the matter will be referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas O. Farrish. (Oliver, T.) |