Delaware District Court
Judge:Gregory B Williams
Case #: 1:25-cv-00533
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:May 01, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
5 5 3 pgs order Order - PLRA for Pay Authorization Fri 05/09 9:34 AM
ORDER granting Motion to Proceed IFP. Filing Fee of $350 Assessed. An initial partial filing fee of $52.74 shall be required. Plaintiff shall return the attached payment authorization within 30 days. Failure to return payment authorization shall result in dismissal of action without prejudice. (Notice of Compliance deadline set for 6/9/2025). Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 05/09/2025. (jfm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Authorization
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 05/07 9:28 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Gregory B. Williams. Please include the initials of the Judge (GBW) after the case number on all documents filed. (alb)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
4 4 misc PLRA - Trust Fund Account Statement Mon 05/05 4:06 PM
Trust Fund Account Statement - filed by Philip C. Harris Randolph (jfm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Envelope
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 05/05 4:05 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Philip C. Harris Randolph.(jfm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Thursday, May 01, 2025
2 2 misc Magistrate Consent Forms Thu 05/01 3:28 PM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (scs)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint - Prisoner 1983 Thu 05/01 3:20 PM
COMPLAINT filed pursuant to 42:1983 with Jury Demand against Scott Ceresini, Marvella Wise, Tyler Elliot, Matthew Long, John Pussey, Tracey Harris (No Civil Cover Sheet, no IFP) - filed by Philip C. Harris Randolph.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope