New York Southern District Court
Judge:Mary Kay Vyskocil
Case #: 1:25-cv-03659
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:2201dj Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:May 01, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 01, 2025 4:08 PM EDT
Defendant
111 West 57th Property Owner LLC
Defendant
JDS Construction Group LLC
Defendant
JRA Marble & Granite Corporation
Defendant
JRA Marble and Construction Corp.
Defendant
JRA Marble and Construction LLC
Nominal Defendant
Rita Mayleny Rodriguez Cotrina
Plaintiff
Hiscox Insurance Company Inc.
Bailey Cavalieri, LLC 10 West Broad Street Suite 2100
Columbus, OH 43215
Represented By
Laura B Dowgin
Kennedys Cmk LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 22 minutes ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
19 19 service Amended Summons Issued Mon 05/12 3:21 PM
ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to JRA Marble and Construction LLC. (vf)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
18 18 service Request for Issuance of Amended Summons Fri 05/09 8:35 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to JRA Marble and Construction, LLC, re:1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Hiscox Insurance Company Inc...(Dowgin, Laura)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 05/08 3:13 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Laura B Dowgin to RE-FILE Document No. 17 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Amended Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
17 17 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 05/07 2:46 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JRA MARBLE AND CONSTRUCTION, LLC, re:1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Hiscox Insurance Company Inc...(Dowgin, Laura)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
16 16 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 05/05 10:40 AM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent ALTOHA INC. for Hiscox Insurance Company Inc.. Document filed by Hiscox Insurance Company Inc...(Dowgin, Laura)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
15 15 service Summons Issued Fri 05/02 2:37 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to JRA Marble and Construction LLC..(gp)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons Issued Fri 05/02 2:35 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to JRA Marble and Construction Corp...(gp)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 05/02 2:24 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JRA Marble and Construction Corp., re:1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Hiscox Insurance Company Inc...(Dowgin, Laura)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 05/02 2:22 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JRA MARBLE AND CONSTRUCTION, LLC, re:1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Hiscox Insurance Company Inc...(Dowgin, Laura)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Issued Fri 05/02 10:54 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to JDS Construction Group LLC..(gp)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Issued Fri 05/02 10:54 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 111 West 57th Property Owner LLC..(gp)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued Fri 05/02 10:54 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to JRA Marble & Granite Corporation..(gp)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 05/02 9:55 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Dowgin, Laura)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Civil Cover Sheet Fri 05/02 9:31 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Laura B Dowgin. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (gp)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 05/02 10:25 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Laura B Dowgin to RE-FILE Document No. 6 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The party entered on the AS TO Section is not the party on the PDF. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (gp)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Fri 05/02 10:27 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 05/02 10:27 AM
Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 05/02 10:32 AM
Case Designated ECF. (gp)
Related: [-]
misc Notice Regarding Deleted Document Fri 05/02 10:50 AM
***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number [8-10] summonses. The documents were filed by clerks office in error. (gp)
Related: [-]
misc Notice Regarding Deleted Document Fri 05/02 2:12 PM
***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to JRA Marble & Granite Corporation.. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (gp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
6 6 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 05/01 4:07 PM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JRA Marble & Granite Corporation, re:1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Hiscox Insurance Company Inc...(Dowgin, Laura) Modified on 5/2/2025 (gp)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 05/01 4:05 PM
FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST As To REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JRA Marble & Granite Corporation, re:1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Hiscox Insurance Company Inc...(Dowgin, Laura) Modified on 5/2/2025 (gp)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 05/01 4:03 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JRA Marble & Granite Corporation, re:1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Hiscox Insurance Company Inc...(Dowgin, Laura)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 05/01 4:02 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JDS Construction Group LLC, re:1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Hiscox Insurance Company Inc...(Dowgin, Laura)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 05/01 4:00 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 111 W 57th Property Owner LLC, re:1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Hiscox Insurance Company Inc...(Dowgin, Laura)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 05/01 3:51 PM
COMPLAINT against 111 West 57th Property Owner LLC, JDS Construction Group LLC, JRA Marble & Granite Corporation, JRA Marble and Construction Corp., JRA Marble and Construction LLC, Rita Mayleny Rodriguez Cotrina. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-31017445)Document filed by Hiscox Insurance Company Inc...(Dowgin, Laura)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Cortina Suit Papers,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - B123 Painting JRA Contract,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - continued,
Att: 4 Exhibit B - continued,
Att: 5 Exhibit B - continued,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit C - JRA Lobbying Agreement,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit D - Trade Agreement,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit E - Policy,
Att: 9 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet