Connecticut District Court
Judge:Michael P Shea
Referred: Maria E Garcia
Case #: 3:25-cv-00700
Nature of Suit864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause42:1383 Review of SSA Decision SSID - SSI Disability Cases
Case Filed:May 01, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, May 05, 2025
10 10 order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 05/05 8:42 AM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis . Plaintiff has filed a motion seeking to proceed without payment of fees and costs, along with a financial affidavit. Plaintiff has fully completed the required information. She asserts that she is unable to afford to pay fees and costs. At this stage, such allegations are sufficient to establish that Plaintiff is unable to pay the ordinary filing fees required by the Court. 28 U.S.C. §1915(a)(1). Accordingly, Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. The Court has also reviewed the Complaint, ECF No. 1, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2) and finds the claim is sufficient to proceed to service of process on the defendant.Signed by Judge Maria E. Garcia on 5/5/25. (Esposito, A.)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
9 9 notice SSA Cases - Notice of New Action Fri 05/02 2:39 PM
Notice of New SSA Action: Electronic service of the complaint was made by the Clerk's Office upon the Social Security Office of General Counsel and the US Attorney's Office for the District of Connecticut. (Chartier, A.)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance - Commissioner Fri 05/02 7:53 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy A. Razel appearing for Commissioner of Social Security, bar number (Paperless filing) (Razel, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
8 8 intord SSA Cases - Notice to Counsel Fri 05/02 2:36 PM
Notice to Counsel: Due to privacy restrictions on social security cases, absent both a consent to electronic notice and an approved motion for efiling privileges, counsel must mail paper copies to self-represented litigants. Signed by Clerk on 5/1/2025.(Chartier, A.)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Electronic Filing Order Fri 05/02 2:35 PM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 5/1/2025.(Chartier, A.)
Related: [-]
6 6 intord SSA Cases - Standing Order Fri 05/02 2:35 PM
Standing Order re: Social Security Cases. Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 5/1/2025.(Chartier, A.)
Related: [-]
5 5 intord SSA Cases - Standing Order re: Assignment Fri 05/02 2:34 PM
Standing Order regarding Assignment of Appeals of Social Security Administration Decisions. Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 5/1/2025.(Chartier, A.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form
4 4 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 05/02 2:29 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Maria E. Garcia for for ruling on motion including2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 5/1/2025.Motions referred to Maria E. Garcia(Chartier, A.)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 05/01 5:10 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sharon Sobolewski.(Yelner, Olia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 05/01 5:00 PM
COMPLAINT against Leland Dudek, Social Security Administration, filed by Sharon Sobolewski.(Yelner, Olia)
Related: [-]
utility NEW Case Assignment Fri 05/02 12:24 PM
CASE ASSIGNMENT: District Judge Michael P Shea assigned to the case. If the District Judge issues an Order of Referral to a Magistrate Judge for any matter other than settlement, the matter will be referred to Magistrate Judge Maria E. Garcia. (Oliver, T.)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Deadline Fri 05/02 2:37 PM
Answer deadline updated for Leland Dudek to 7/1/2025. (Chartier, A.)
Related: [-]