Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Mary S Scriven
Referred: Lindsay S Griffin
Case #: 8:25-cv-01119
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:May 01, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 01, 2025 5:09 PM EDT
Defendant
Trevor McNally
7003 Whig Hill Drive
Spotsylvania, VA 22551
Plaintiff
PROVEN INDUSTRIES INC
2310 S Dock St. Unit 111
Palmetto, FL 34221


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, May 12, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of appearance Mon 05/12 2:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Hayes on behalf of Trevor McNally (Hayes, David)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of appearance Mon 05/12 2:56 PM
NOTICE of Designation of Lead Counsel and Appearance by Kenneth George Turkel on behalf of Trevor McNally (Turkel, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
7 7 service Waiver of service executed Wed 05/07 3:14 PM
WAIVER of service returned executed on 05/07/2025 by Proven Industries, Inc. as to All Defendants. (Fahey, Derek)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 05/05 2:09 PM
NOTICE to Counsel of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BCH)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Mon 05/05 11:35 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Proven Industries, Inc.. (Fahey, Derek)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Copyright Report Mon 05/05 10:21 AM
Copyright Report electronically sent to the U.S. Copyright Office. (MLB)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons issued Mon 05/05 10:14 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Trevor McNally. (MLB)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 05/02 9:37 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Lindsay S. Griffin. New case number: 8:25-cv-01119-MSS-LSG. (JOS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
1 1 33 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 05/01 5:41 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-23313130) filed by All Plaintiffs.(Fahey, Derek)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 6 Proposed Summons