Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Jose E Martinez
Case #: 1:25-cv-22020
Nature of Suit340 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine
Cause28:1332 Diversity
Case Filed:May 01, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 01, 2025 5:09 PM EDT
Defendant
Royal Carribean Cruises Ltd.
Plaintiff
GILAD LANDAU
Represented By
Carol Lynn Finklehoffe
Lipcon Margulies Alsina & Winkleman, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
4 4 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Tue 05/06 9:40 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Gilad Landau, Maya Landau. Royal Carribean Cruises Ltd. served on 5/5/2025, response/answer due 5/27/2025. (Finklehoffe, Carol)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 05/02 10:51 AM
Summons Issued as to Royal Carribean Cruises Ltd.. (jas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Fri 05/02 10:45 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Eduardo I. Sanchez is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (jas)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 05/01 4:06 PM
COMPLAINT against Royal Carribean Cruises Ltd.. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18416097, filed by GILAD LANDAU.(Finklehoffe, Carol)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s)