New York Southern District Court
Judge:Analisa Torres
Case #: 1:25-cv-03665
Nature of Suit462 Immigration - Naturalization Application
Cause05:552(a) Complaint in the Nature of Mandamus
Case Filed:May 01, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 01, 2025 5:09 PM EDT
All Defendants
Pamela Bondi
U.S. Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530
All Defendants
Dist. Dir. USCIS Michael Borgen
Jacob K. Javit Federal Building 26 Federal Plaza 3rd Floor, Room 3-120
New York, NY 10278
All Defendants
Rose Kendrick
All Defendants
Secretary Kristi Noem
All Defendants
Kash Patel
All Defendants
Leslie Rodrigues Backshires
All Defendants
director KIKA SCOTT
United States Citizenship and Immigration Services 20 Massachusetts Avenue
NW Washington, DC 20529
All Plaintiffs
Richard Belemkoabga
100 Church St. 8th Fl., Rm. 865, New York
New York, NY 10007
Represented By
Nicole Abruzzo Hemrick
Hemrick PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
8 8 4 pgs order Order Thu 05/08 10:45 AM
ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. § 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, counsel for Defendant shall, by September 4, 2025, e-mail a fully executed Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form, available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/node/754 and attached to this order, to Orders_and_Judgments@nysd.uscourts.gov. If the Court approves that form, all further proceedings will then be conducted before the assigned Magistrate Judge rather than before me. An information sheet on proceedings before magistrate judges is also attached to this order. Any appeal would be taken directly to the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, as it would be if the consent form were not signed and so ordered. If any party does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, the parties must file a joint letter September 4, 2025, advising the Court that the parties do not consent, but without disclosing the identity of the party or parties who do not consent. The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/8/2025) (ks)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs order Order Thu 05/08 10:44 AM
ORDER: To protect the public health, while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b) (5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place "before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28" if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discovery through remote means at every available opportunity. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/8/2025) (ks)
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs order Order Thu 05/08 10:43 AM
INITIAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to submit a joint letter and a jointly proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order by September 4, 2025, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the instructions set forth below. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/8/2025) (ks)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 05/07 1:32 PM
FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PAMELA BONDI, KRISTI NOEM, KIKA SCOTT, ROSE KENDRICK, MICAHEL BORGEN, KASH PATEL, LESLIE RODRIGUES BECKSHIRES, re:4 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus,. Document filed by Richard Belemkoabga..(Hemrick, Nicole) Modified on 5/7/2025 (gp).
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus Wed 05/07 1:31 PM
COMPLAINT IN THE NATURE OF MANDAMUS against Pamela Bondi, Michael Borgen, Rose Kendrick, Kristi Noem, Kash Patel, Leslie Rodrigues Backshires, Kika Scott.Document filed by Richard Belemkoabga..(Hemrick, Nicole) Modified on 5/7/2025 (gp).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-E
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet Wed 05/07 3:34 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Nicole Abruzzo Hemrick to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated December 4, 2024;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated December 4, 2024. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated December 4, 2024 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-cover-sheet-2.. (gp)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 05/07 3:36 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 05/07 3:36 PM
Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 05/07 3:36 PM
Case Designated ECF. (gp)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 05/07 3:39 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Nicole Abruzzo Hemrick to RE-FILE Document No. 5 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct (the rider is not attached to the summons). Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (gp)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Fri 05/02 11:32 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Nicole Abruzzo Hemrick. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: all defendants. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (gp)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Fri 05/02 11:34 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Nicole Abruzzo Hemrick to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the pleading;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. Attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 5/7/2025. (gp)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 05/02 11:37 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Nicole Abruzzo Hemrick to RE-FILE Document No. 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The summons requested was not processed due to the deficient pleading. Please file your request for summons with the attached rider when the pleading has been refiled.(gp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 05/01 4:57 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PAMELA BONDI, KRISTI NOEM, KIKA SCOTT, ROSE KENDRICK, MICAHEL BORGEN, KASH PATEL, LESLIE RODRIGUES BECKSHIRES, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Richard Belemkoabga..(Hemrick, Nicole)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 05/01 4:55 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Hemrick, Nicole)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 05/01 4:54 PM
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - COMPLAINT against Pamela Bondi, Michael Borgen, Rose Kendrick, Kristi Noem, Kash Patel, Leslie Rodrigues Backshires, KIKA SCOTT. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-31018749)Document filed by Richard Belemkoabga..(Hemrick, Nicole) Modified on 5/2/2025 (gp).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-E