South Carolina District Court
Judge:Donald C Coggins, Jr
Case #: 8:25-cv-03671
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:May 01, 2025
Case in other court:Anderson County Court of Common Pleas, 2025-CP-04-00655
Last checked: Thursday May 01, 2025 5:12 PM EDT
Defendant
State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By
Lisa B Bisso
Butler Snow - Chas Sc
contact info
Robert E Sumner, IV
Butler Snow - Chas Sc
contact info
Plaintiff
Claude A Durham
Represented By
Geoffrey William Gibbon
Fayssoux And Landis Attorneys At Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
10 10 notice Notice and Acknowledgment of Removal Mon 05/05 10:07 AM
NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Anderson County County.(Bisso, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Notice of Removal
Friday, May 02, 2025
9 9 order Pretrial Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 05/02 4:33 PM
ORDER AND NOTICE SETTING Pretrial Telephone Conference. Conference set for Wednesday, June 11, 2025 at 10:30 AM before Honorable Donald C Coggins Jr. Defendant's counsel is directed to arrange and initiate the conference call, conference in all other participating counsel, and then connect to chambers at 864-591-5340. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 5/2/25. (alew, )
Related: [-]
8 8 order Scheduling Order Fri 05/02 4:28 PM
CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 5/22/2025, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 7/16/2025, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 8/11/2025, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 9/9/2025, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 9/29/2025, Discovery due by 10/29/2025, Motions due by 11/12/2025, Mediation Due by 11/26/2025, Motion in Limine due by 12/29/2025, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 1/6/2026, Jury Selection Deadline 1/27/2026. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 5/2/25. (alew)
Related: [-]
7 7 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Fri 05/02 10:43 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Claude A Durham.(Gibbon, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
5 5 notice Notice Other Thu 05/01 3:37 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiff's Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories are due 14 days after removal. (alew)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 05/01 3:31 PM
ANSWER to State Court Complaint by State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company.(alew)
Related: [-]
3 3 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Thu 05/01 3:27 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Claude A Durham.(alew)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 05/01 3:16 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Anderson County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2025-CP 04-00655 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-12428280), filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company.(alew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-State Court Documents