California Northern District Court
Judge:Laurel Beeler
Case #: 3:25-cv-03793
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:May 01, 2025
Case in other court:Alameda Superior Court, 25CV113668
Last checked: Thursday May 01, 2025 3:05 PM PDT
Defendant
Lawrence Livermore National Security, LLC
Defendant
North Wind Services, LLC
Represented By
Alison Le Tsao
Cdf Labor Law LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Alex W. Smith


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, May 02, 2025
9 9 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Fri 05/02 10:35 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See [LINK:General Order 71] . Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 7/24/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2025 11:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Fri 05/02 9:44 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Candace Rose DesBaillets on behalf of North Wind Services, LLC (DesBaillets, Candace)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Fri 05/02 9:39 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Marianne C. Koepf on behalf of North Wind Services, LLC (Koepf, Marianne)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Fri 05/02 9:35 AM
NOTICE by North Wind Services, LLC re 1 Notice of Removal, Notice to Adverse Parties of Assignment of Judge (Tsao, Alison)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
5 5 service Certificate/Proof of Service Thu 05/01 3:52 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by North Wind Services, LLC re1 Notice of Removal,2 Certificate of Interested Entities,3 Certificate of Service of Notice to Adverse Party and State Court of Removal Action to Federal Court (Tsao, Alison)
Related: [-]
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 05/01 2:48 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/15/2025. (smc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Certificate/Proof of Service Thu 05/01 2:25 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by North Wind Services, LLC re1 Notice of Removal,2 Certificate of Interested Entities, (Tsao, Alison)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 05/01 2:23 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by North Wind Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent North Wind Services, LLC, Other Affiliate CIRI Development Corporation dba North Wind Group, Other Affiliate CIRI Development Corporation, Other Affiliate Cook Inlet Region, Inc. for North Wind Services, LLC. re1 Notice of Removal, (Tsao, Alison)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 05/01 2:14 PM
Answer to Removal Complaint, See Attachment #1 (Declaration of Alison L. Tsao - Exhibit L) of Notice of Removal by Lawrence Livermore National Security, LLC. (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Alison L. Tsao,
Att: 2 Declaration of Dean Vanek,
Att: 3 Declaration of Randy Field,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet