Tallman v. Federal Government et al
Illinois Central District Court | |
Judge: | Sara Darrow |
Referred: | Ronald L Hanna |
Case #: | 4:25-cv-04086 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1981 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | May 01, 2025 |
Last checked: Thursday May 01, 2025 5:05 PM CDT |
Defendant
Davenport County
|
|
Defendant
Federal Government
|
|
Defendant
Rock Island County
|
|
Defendant
State of Illinois
|
|
Defendant
State of Iowa
|
|
Plaintiff
Ryan JW Tallman
2301 1st St E Apt D8
Milan, IL 61264 |
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Friday, May 02, 2025 | ||
order
Order
Fri 05/02 2:22 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Plaintiff has filed a1 Complaint but has not paid the $402 filing fee nor filed a petition to proceed in forma pauperis . If Plaintiff intends to file a lawsuit in this Court, Plaintiff must file it in the form of a civil complaint accompanied either by the filing fee or a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis . Within 21 days of the entry of this order (5/23/2025), the Plaintiff must pay the $402 filing fee in full or file a petition to proceed in forma pauperis . Moreover, the document appears to be a complaint against the federal government and multiple states and their entities seeking damages in the amount of 70 million dollars. Plaintiff is on notice that a pro se complaint must be dismissed "if it is legally frivolous, malicious, fails to state a claim upon which relief may be granted or asks for money damages from a defendant who by law cannot be sued for money damages." Farris v. Shelton , No. 25-cv-02020, (C.D. Ill. Feb. 10, 2025) (Doc. 3 at 1). The Clerk's office is directed to send Plaintiff a petition to proceed in forma pauperis , a blank civil rights complaint, and Form AO 239 to Plaintiff via mail and email. Failure to comply without good cause will result in dismissal of this case without prejudice. That is, if no complaint and filing fee or motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is received by 5/23/2025, the Court will close this case. Entered by Magistrate Judge Ronald L Hanna on 05/02/2025. (NJR) |
||
Thursday, May 01, 2025 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT filed by Ryan JW Tallman. Filing Fee not paid and IFP not filed.(SB) |