New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Elizabeth S Stong
Case #: 1:25-bk-42135
Case Filed:May 01, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Fatema & Salma LLC
8740 - 185 Street Apt 5K
Jamaica, NY 11432
Represented By
Fatema & Salma LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
Eastern District of NY (Brooklyn) Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green Room 510
New York, NY 10004


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 6:06 PM EDT
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice/Order Thu 05/08 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice/Order Notice Date 05/07/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 04, 2025
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Mon 05/05 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 05/04/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 03, 2025
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing Sun 05/04 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing Notice Date 05/03/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Hearing on Defective or Deficient Filing Ch. 11 Sun 05/04 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Hearing on Defective or Deficient Filing - Chapter 11 Non-Individual Notice Date 05/03/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
9 9 order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference (Ch 11) All Judges Mon 05/05 10:35 AM
Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference . Signed on 5/2/2025. Status hearing to be held on 6/20/2025 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 3585 (Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. (nwh)
Related: [-]
5 5 trustee Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 - US Trustee Fri 05/02 10:04 AM
Meeting of Creditors Filed by Office of the United States Trustee. 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/2/2025 at 01:00 PM at Telephonic Meeting: Phone 1 (866) 919-4760, Participant Code 4081400, Enter # sign. (Sussman, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
4 4 court Notice of Hearing of Defective or Deficient Filing of Non-Individual Chapter 11 Case Thu 05/01 4:30 PM
Notice of Hearing on Deficient Chapter 11 Case for Debtor's Failure to be Represented by Counsel.Hearing scheduled for 6/20/2025 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 3585 (Judge Stong), Brooklyn, NY. . Chapter 11 Non-Individual Attorney Cure due by 5/15/2025. Related [+] (gem)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Fatema & Salma LLC
3 3 court Deficient Filing Chapter 11 Thu 05/01 12:57 PM
Deficient Filing Chapter 11 Statement Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1073-2b due by 5/1/2025.Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-4 due 5/1/2025. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 5/1/2025. Corporate Resolution Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1074-1(a) due by 5/1/2025. Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FBR 1007(a)(1) due 5/1/2025. Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FBR 1073-3 due 5/1/2025. Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals Official Form 206Sum due by 5/15/2025. Schedule A/B due 5/15/2025. Schedule D due 5/15/2025. Schedule E/F due 5/15/2025. Schedule G due 5/15/2025. Schedule H due 5/15/2025. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors Official Form 202 due 5/15/2025. List of Equity Security Holders due 5/15/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs Non-Ind Form 207 due 5/15/2025. Incomplete Filings due by 5/15/2025. (gem)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Thu 05/01 12:40 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount $ 1738. Filed by Fatema & Salma LLC Chapter 11 Plan due by 8/29/2025. Disclosure Statement due by 8/29/2025. (gem)
Related: [-]
court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Auto Thu 05/01 7:30 PM
Receipt of Chapter 11 Filing Fee - $1,738.00. Receipt Number 10336007. (SR) (admin)
Related: [-]