Delaware District Court
Judge:Richard G Andrews
Case #: 1:25-cv-00524
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 02, 2025 1:07 AM EDT
Defendant
BMG & Associates, LLC
Plaintiff
Lazarus Games, LLC
Represented By
John David Simmons
Panitch Schwarze Belisario & Nadel LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 05/07 9:37 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (alb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
4 4 misc Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1 Thu 05/01 10:01 AM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Lazarus Games, LLC. (Simmons, John)
Related: [-]
service No Summons Issued Thu 05/01 11:08 AM
No Summons Issued. (scs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
3 3 misc Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents Thu 05/01 9:38 AM
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) Reg. No. 7,754,710. (scs)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Magistrate Consent Forms Thu 05/01 9:37 AM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (scs)
Related: [-]
1 1 17 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 05/01 9:36 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against BMG & Associates, LLC (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ADEDC-4675173) - filed by Lazarus Games, LLC.(scs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Deficiency Notice - No 7.1 Statement Filed Thu 05/01 9:39 AM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE issued by the Court to Plaintiff: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 (b)(1), A party must: (1) file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Counsel is requested to supplement the docket with an appropriate Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (scs)
Related: [-]