District Of Columbia District Court
Case #: 1:25-cv-01256
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 25, 2025
Terminated:May 07, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 09, 2025 6:03 AM EDT
Defendant
STATE OF TEXAS
Plaintiff
TONI VAN GOMPEL
P.O. Box 27501
Austin, TX 78755

GPO May 07 2025
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/7/2025. (zmtm)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
5 5 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Pro Se Case Wed 05/07 1:24 PM
ORDER DISMISSING PRO SE CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Ordered that the application of the plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. This is a final appealable Order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail.. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/7/. (zmtm)
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Wed 05/07 1:13 PM
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/7/2025. (zmtm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
misc Receipt of Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Thu 05/01 3:05 PM
Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmgb)
Related: [-]