Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Thomas W Thrash, Jr
Referred: Anna W Howard
Case #: 1:25-cv-02414
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 02, 2025 1:10 AM EDT
Defendant
Equifax Information Services LLC
Defendant
National Credit Systems, Inc.
Defendant
Trans Union LLC
Plaintiff
Tavaris Devante Scruggs
Represented By
Octavio Gomez
The Consumer Lawyers, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
misc Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP Mon 05/05 3:01 PM
Clerk's Notation re3 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Reviewed and approved by Judge Thrash. (jeh)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
3 3 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 05/02 11:13 AM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tavaris Devante Scruggs. (Gomez, Octavio)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Thu 05/01 9:13 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services LLC, National Credit Systems, Inc. and Trans Union LLC.(dgr) Modified on 5/1/2025 to correct file date (dgr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Trans Union,
Att: 2 Summons National Credit
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 05/01 9:12 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Tavaris Devante Scruggs. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-14263112)(dgr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet