Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:J P Boulee
Case #: 1:25-cv-02416
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 02, 2025 1:10 AM EDT
Defendant
The United States of America
Defendant
Kimyatta Williams
Plaintiff
PennyMac Loan Services, LLC
Represented By
Thomas Sears
Padgett Law Group
contact info
Devon Worth Reeves, I
Padgett Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
6 6 30+ pgs order Order Thu 05/08 10:30 AM
STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on May 8, 2025. (jkl)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Thu 05/08 9:45 AM
ORDER declining assignment of case. Case reassigned to Judge J. P. Boulee for all further proceedings. Judge Amy Totenberg no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:25-cv-2416-JPB. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 5/8/25. (jpa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
4 4 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 05/01 4:27 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. (Sears, Thomas)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued as to USA Thu 05/01 9:49 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to The United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(djs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons AUSA
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Thu 05/01 9:46 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Kimyatta Williams. (djs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
1 1 4 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 05/01 9:43 AM
COMPLAINT (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-14263121) filed by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC.(djs) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet