Maryland District Court
Judge:Paula Xinis
Case #: 8:25-cv-01377
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 02, 2025 8:04 AM EDT
Defendant
J.J.F. Management Services, Inc.
Plaintiff
Christopher Amrine
Represented By
Nicholas A Migliaccio
Migliaccio & Rathod LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
4 4 1 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/07 3:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jason S Rathod on behalf of Christopher Amrine (Rathod, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
3 3 22 pgs motion Consolidate Cases Tue 05/06 7:25 PM
MOTION to Consolidate Cases AND TO APPOINT INTERIM LEADERSHIP COUNSEL by Christopher Amrine(Migliaccio, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 21 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 2 22 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 3 8 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 4 4 pgs Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, May 01, 2025
2 2 2 pgs service Summons Issued Thu 05/01 10:17 AM
Summons Issued 21 days as to J.J.F. Management Services, Inc.(kb3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
1 1 39 pgs COMPLAINT against J.J.F. Management Services, Inc.( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number BMDDC-11944906.), filed by Christopher Amrine.(Migliaccio, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 2 pgs Summons
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 05/01 9:35 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Paula Xinis. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]