Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Michael S Nachmanoff
Referred: William B Porter
Case #: 1:25-cv-00746
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Federal Question
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2025
Terminated:May 07, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 02, 2025 1:21 AM EDT
Defendant
Staples Inc.
Plaintiff
Dora L. Adkins
P.O Box 3825
Merrifield, VA 22116


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
4 4 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Order on Motion to Expedite Wed 05/07 11:35 AM
ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave (ECF1) and Motion to Expedite (ECF 2) be and are DENIED (see Order for further details). Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 5/7/2025. (Dest)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
3 3 misc Waiver of Thu 05/01 1:37 PM
Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument by Dora L. Adkins (swil)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Expedite Thu 05/01 1:36 PM
MOTION to Expedite by Dora L. Adkins. (swil)
Related: [-]
1 1 4 pgs motion Leave to File Document Thu 05/01 1:35 PM
MOTION for Leave from the Court to File a Proposed Emergency Complaint by Dora L. Adkins.(swil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Emergency Complaint,
Att: 2 Receipt