Texas Western District Court
Judge:Leon Schydlower
Case #: 3:25-cv-00154
Nature of Suit362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice
Cause28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 02, 2025 3:14 AM CDT
Defendant
Pete Hegseth
Plaintiff
Angel D. Walker
4756 Robert Acosta Drive
El Paso, TX 79934


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
4 4 misc Certified Mailing Wed 05/07 11:32 AM
Certified Mailing TO ANGEL D. WALKER of3 Order Denying Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. (em)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
3 3 2 pgs order Order Tue 05/06 6:50 PM
ORDER DENYING2 Pro Se MOTION for Permission to file Electronically,1 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge Leon Schydlower. (LS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
2 2 motion Electronic Filing Thu 05/01 4:20 PM
Pro Se MOTION for Permission to file Electronically by Angel D. Walker. (em)
Related: [-]
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 05/01 4:16 PM
MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Angel D. Walker.(em) (em)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit A (REDACTED),
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
Att: 4 (5/1/2025) UNREDACTED EXHIBIT
misc To be Referred to EP Mag Judge Thu 05/01 4:22 PM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Enriquez (em)
Related: [-]