Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Terry R Means
Case #: 4:25-cv-00474
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, May 05, 2025
4 4 2 pgs order Order Mon 05/05 5:00 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: If Angel intends to proceed with this action, he must, within 30 days, file a supplement to his petition, showing cause as to why his petition should not be denied based on his procedural default. His supplement may not exceed five pages. If Angel does not comply with this order, the Court will dismiss this action without prejudice without further notice for failure to prosecute. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 5/5/2025) (saw)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Mon 05/05 5:01 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Mon May 5 17:01:36 CDT 2025 (crt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
misc Order Receipt Thu 05/01 3:09 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2, 3. Thu May 1 15:09:46 CDT 2025 (crt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
3 3 notice Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party Thu 05/01 3:09 PM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (saw)
Related: [-]
2 2 qcref Means Thu 05/01 3:08 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the[LINK:national] and[LINK:circuit] indexes.) File to: appropriate staff attorney. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (saw)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Thu 05/01 3:05 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Sergio Angel. (Filing fee $5; receipt number 400004522) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (saw)
Related: [-]