Arizona District Court
Case #: 2:25-cr-00642
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 02, 2025 1:14 AM MST
Defendant
Hector Ivan Hernandez-Ramirez Jr. (1)
Represented By
James Rael
Federal Public Defender'S Office - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Defendant
Audomar Valenzuela-Sanchez (2)
Represented By
Joseph Anthony Duarte
Joseph A Duarte, Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Travis L Wheeler
Us Attorneys Office - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Stuart James Zander
Us Attorneys Office - Phoenix, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 3:02 AM MST
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
Arrest of Audomar Valenzuela-Sanchez on 4/1/2025. (SPW) [2:25-mj-08224-JZB]
Related: [-]
Arrest of Hector Ivan Hernandez-Ramirez Jr. on 4/1/2025. (SPW) [2:25-mj-08224-JZB]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to (1) Hector Ivan Hernandez-Ramirez Jr., (2) Audomar Valenzuela-Sanchez. (SPW) [2:25-mj-08224-JZB]
Related: [-]
4 4 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle: Initial Appearance as to Hector Ivan Hernandez-Ramirez Jr. held on 4/2/2025. FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT REVIEWED. Appointing AFPD James Rael for Defendant. Government is seeking detention. Counsel requests a detention hearing. Granted as set forth below. Preliminary Hearing waived. Finding: Defendant held to answer before District Court. Defendant shall remain temporarily detained pending further proceedings. As required by Rule 5(f), the United States is ordered to produce all information required by Brady v. Maryland and its progeny. Not doing so in a timely manner may result in sanctions including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, and contempt proceedings. Appearances : AUSA Brandon Brown for Stuart Zander for the Government, AFPD James Rael for Defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Spanish Interpreter Beatriz Bogard assists Defendant. Detention Hearing set for 4/4/2025 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 302, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle. Related [+] Hearing held 2:50 PM to 2:53 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (AO) [2:25-mj-08224-JZB]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART
5 5 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle: Initial Appearance as to Audomar Valenzuela-Sanchez held on 4/2/2025. FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT REVIEWED. Appointing CJA Attorney Joseph Anthony Duarte for Defendant. Detention Hearing submitted to the Court. Defendant ordered detained pending trial as a flight risk. Preliminary Hearing waived. Finding: Defendant held to answer before District Court. SPANISH Interpreter required for Defendant. As required by Rule 5(f), the United States is ordered to produce all information required by Brady v. Maryland and its progeny. Not doing so in a timely manner may result in sanctions including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, and contempt proceedings. Appearances : AUSA Brandon Brown for Stuart Zander for the Government, CJA Attorney Joseph Duarte for Defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Spanish Interpreter Beatriz Bogard assists Defendant. Related [+] Hearing held 2:50 PM to 2:53 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (AO) [2:25-mj-08224-JZB]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART
6 6 ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, the United States is ordered to disclose in a timely manner all exculpatory evidence to the defendant(s), that is, all evidence that is favorable to the defendant(s) or tends to cast doubt on the United States' case, as required by Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Failure to comply with this order may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, the reversal of any conviction, the exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, and/or sanctions by the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle.(AO)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) [2:25-mj-08224-JZB]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
7 7 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Audomar Valenzuela-Sanchez. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 4/2/2025. (AO) [2:25-mj-08224-JZB]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
9 9 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle: Detention Hearing as to Hector Ivan Hernandez-Ramirez Jr. held on 4/4/2025. Government is seeking detention. Discussion held. For reasons stated on the record, Defendant ordered to remain detained pending trial as a flight risk without prejudice, with leave to reopen shall new information become available. Counsel is directed to file a motion on the issue of detention if the Defendant's related case is resolved. Appearances : AUSA Stuart Zander for the Government, AFPD James Rael for Defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Related [+] Hearing held 4:09 PM to 4:14 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (AO) [2:25-mj-08224-JZB]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART
Monday, April 07, 2025
10 10 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Hector Ivan Hernandez-Ramirez Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 4/7/2025. (AO) [2:25-mj-08224-JZB]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
11 11 INDICTMENT Related [+] as to Hector Ivan Hernandez-Ramirez Jr. (1) count(s) 1, Audomar Valenzuela-Sanchez (2) count(s) 1. Arraignment set for 5/7/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 304, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Alison S Bachus. (MAP)
Related: [-] dacted for Public Disclosure
12 12 DOJ CONFLICT MEMO. No probable conflict re Judge Krissa M. Lanham. Filed by USA as to Hector Ivan Hernandez-Ramirez Jr., Audomar Valenzuela-Sanchez. (MAP)
Related: [-]
13 13 *SEALED UNREDACTED INDICTMENT as to Hector Ivan Hernandez-Ramirez Jr., Audomar Valenzuela-Sanchez. (MAP) *Modified file date from 4/30/2025 to 4/29/2025 on 5/1/2025 (CEI).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Case Summaries