Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 5:25-cr-00637
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 02, 2025 2:26 AM CDT
Defendant
Anthony William Martinez (1)
Represented By
Federal Public Defender - Laredo
contact info
Rolando Charles, Jr
Federal Public Defender Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Steven Scott Chamberlin
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 3:40 AM CDT
Monday, April 07, 2025
1 1 Proposed COMPLAINT as to Anthony William Martinez (1), filed (Webb). Initial Appearance set for 4/8/2025 at 09:31 AM before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos (dlg5) [5:25-mj-00635]
Related: [-]
2 2 Statement in Support of Probable Cause by USA as to Anthony William Martinez, filed. (dlg5) [5:25-mj-00635]
Related: [-]
3 3 FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ON STATEMENT on April 7, 2025 at 03:03 PM as to Anthony William Martinez. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (dlg5) [5:25-mj-00635]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
US ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. Melissa Andrea Lopez appearing for USA, filed. (Lopez, Melissa) [5:25-mj-00635]
Related: [-]
Attorney update in case as to Anthony William Martinez. Attorney Federal Public Defender - Laredo for Anthony William Martinez added. (mlr5) [5:25-mj-00635]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos. INITIAL APPEARANCE on Complaint as to Anthony William Martinez held on 4/8/2025. Defendant advised of charge(s) and rights. Defendant requests appointed counsel. Financial Affidavit executed. Order appointing Federal Public Defender. Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing. No bond set. Court issued oral order regarding prosecutorial obligations under Rule 5(f) and Rule 12.4. All parties appeared in person. Defendant sworn in. Defendant submitted written waiver of Preliminary Examination Hearing to the Court, however requests to proceed with upcoming Detention Hearing as scheduled before the Court. Appearances: Melissa Andrea Lopez AUSA; FPD John S. Paul (on duty); USPTO: Priscilla Ortiz; USM: Deputy Enrique Granados. (Opened/Adjourned: 9:30 AM - 9:55 AM) (ERO: Emmanuel Garcia) (Interpreter: Eduardo Canudas, not used) Defendant remanded to custody. Preliminary Examination & Detention Hearing set for 4/15/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga. (mlr5) [5:25-mj-00635]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Rolando Charles, Jr, Federal Public Defender, in case as to Anthony William Martinez, filed. (Charles, Rolando) [5:25-mj-00635]
Related: [-]
4 4 COMPLAINT accepted by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos as to Anthony William Martinez, filed. Agent: Marco A. Rodriguez (mlr5) [5:25-mj-00635]
Related: [-]
5 5 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Anthony William Martinez, filed. (bm5). [5:25-mj-00635]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (mlr5) [5:25-mj-00635]
Related: [-]
7 7 BRADY AND FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE ORDER on Rule 5(f) and Rule 12.4 as to Anthony William Martinez. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (mlr5) [5:25-mj-00635]
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE OF SETTING as to Anthony William Martinez. Preliminary Examination Hearing set for 4/15/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga. (mlr5) [5:25-mj-00635]
Related: [-]
9 9 Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing as to Anthony William Martinez. Detention Hearing set for 4/15/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (mlr5) [5:25-mj-00635]
Related: [-]
10 10 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Anthony William Martinez, filed. (bm5) [5:25-mj-00635]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga: DETENTION HEARING as to Anthony William Martinez held on 4/15/2025. For reasons stated on the record, the Government requested detention, the Defense requested bond. The Court took matters under advisement, order to be issued. Appearances: Bryan Lyndell Oliver, AUSA; David Castillo f/Defendant; USPO: Jesse Berber; USM: Deputy Reyes. (In Court Time: 10:51-11:05) (ERO: David Morales) (Interpreter: Marianna Rios/not used) Deft remanded to custody. (fv5) [5:25-mj-00635]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
11 11 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Anthony William Martinez ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga) Parties notified. (vm5) [5:25-mj-00635]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
12 12 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Anthony William Martinez. NOTICE: Document available to applicable parties only. Authorized users enter CM/ECF Filer login and password first for authentication. Be sure to SAVE the document locally at the time of viewing , filed. (iae5) [5:25-mj-00635]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
13 13 Notice of Substitution by USA as to defendant Anthony William Martinez. Attorney Steven Chamberlin added. Attorney Melissa Andrea Lopez terminated, filed. (Chamberlin, Steven) [5:25-mj-00635]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
14 14 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Anthony William Martinez (1) count(s) 1, filed. (scg5)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment