Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 5:25-cr-00633
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 02, 2025 2:38 AM CDT
Defendant
Damian Diaz-Teco (1)
Represented By
David Castillo
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Federal Public Defender - Laredo
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info
Tory Robert Sailer
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 4:01 AM CDT
Friday, April 04, 2025
1 1 Proposed COMPLAINT as to Damian Diaz-Teco (1), filed (Webb). Initial Appearance set for 4/7/2025 at 09:35 AM before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos (vm5) [5:25-mj-00623]
Related: [-]
2 2 Statement in Support of Probable Cause by USA as to Damian Diaz-Teco, filed. (vm5) [5:25-mj-00623]
Related: [-]
3 3 FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ON STATEMENT on April 4, 2025 at 03:17 PM as to Damian Diaz-Teco. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (vm5) [5:25-mj-00623]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
Attorney update in case as to Damian Diaz-Teco. Attorney Federal Public Defender - Laredo for Damian Diaz-Teco added. (mlr5) [5:25-mj-00623]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos. INITIAL APPEARANCE on Complaint as to Damian Diaz-Teco held on 4/7/2025. Defendant advised of charge(s) and rights. Defendant requests appointed counsel. Financial Affidavit executed. Order appointing Federal Public Defender. Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing. No bond set. Court issued oral order regarding prosecutorial obligations under Rule 5(f) and Rule 12.4. All parties appeared in person. Defendant sworn in. Defendant submitted written waiver of Preliminary Examination and Detention Hearing to the Court. Termination of applicable hearings to follow accordingly. Appearances: Tory Robert Sailer AUSA; FPD Sara A. Martinez (on duty); USPTO: Brenda Garza; USM: Deputy Alexis Aguero. (Opened/Adjourned: 9:30 AM - 9:55 AM) (ERO: Emmanuel Garcia) (Interpreter: Steve Mines, used) Defendant remanded to custody. Preliminary Examination & Detention Hearing set for 4/11/2025 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos. (mlr5) [5:25-mj-00623]
Related: [-]
**Terminate Deadlines and Hearings as to Damian Diaz-Teco: Prelim Exam and Detention Hrg terminated. (mlr5) [5:25-mj-00623]
Related: [-]
4 4 COMPLAINT accepted by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos as to Damian Diaz-Teco, filed. Agent: Luis I Molina Castro (mlr5) [5:25-mj-00623]
Related: [-]
5 5 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Damian Diaz-Teco, filed. (mtl5). [5:25-mj-00623]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (mlr5) [5:25-mj-00623]
Related: [-]
7 7 BRADY AND FINANCIAL DISCLOSURE ORDER on Rule 5(f) and Rule 12.4 as to Damian Diaz-Teco. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (mlr5) [5:25-mj-00623]
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE OF SETTING as to Damian Diaz-Teco. Preliminary Examination Hearing set for 4/11/2025 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos. (mlr5) [5:25-mj-00623]
Related: [-]
9 9 Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing as to Damian Diaz-Teco. Detention Hearing set for 4/11/2025 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (mlr5) [5:25-mj-00623]
Related: [-]
10 10 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Damian Diaz-Teco, filed. (mtl5) [5:25-mj-00623]
Related: [-]
11 11 WAIVER of Detention Hearing by Defendant Damian Diaz-Teco, filed. (mtl5) [5:25-mj-00623]
Related: [-]
12 12 Order of Detention Pending Trial as to Damian Diaz-Teco. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (mlr5) [5:25-mj-00623]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE David Castillo, Federal Public Defender, in case as to Damian Diaz-Teco, filed. (Castillo, David) [5:25-mj-00623]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
13 13 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Damian Diaz-Teco. NOTICE: Document available to applicable parties only. Authorized users enter CM/ECF Filer login and password first for authentication. Be sure to SAVE the document locally at the time of viewing , filed. (iae5) [5:25-mj-00623]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
14 14 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Damian Diaz-Teco (1) count(s) 1, filed. (egg5)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment