Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 7:25-cr-00767
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 02, 2025 2:49 AM CDT
Defendant
Brandon Lerma-Perez (1)
Represented By
Miriam Berenice Aguayo
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Federal Public Defender - McAllen
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Miroslava Alexis Garcia
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 4:21 AM CDT
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
1 1 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Brandon Lerma-Perez (1), filed. (yi7) [7:25-mj-00653]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
Arrest of Brandon Lerma-Perez, filed. (jen7) [7:25-mj-00653]
Related: [-]
3 3 Arrest Warrant issued 04/02/2025; Returned Executed on 04/07/2025 as to Brandon Lerma-Perez.. Document restricted from PACER under privacy policy., filed. (sr7) [7:25-mj-00653]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
***Set/Reset Hearings as to Brandon Lerma-Perez: Initial Appearance set for 4/8/2025 at 09:00 AM in the 8th Floor Courtroom before U.S. Magistrate Judge J. Scott Hacker. (df7) [7:25-mj-00653]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge J. Scott Hacker. INITIAL APPEARANCE, PRELIMINARY HEARING, AND DETENTION HEARING on Criminal Complaint as to Brandon Lerma-Perez held on 4/8/2025. Defendant placed under oath. Defendant present in the courtroom. Defendant informed of legal rights, including the right to have a consular official notified about the arrest. Defendant affirmed that the Financial Affidavit was correct and requested court-appointed counsel, which the Court GRANTED. Federal Public Defender appointed to represent Defendant. The Court advised Defendant as to the charged offense and any factual allegations in the criminal complaint. Defendant, through counsel, waived both the Preliminary and Detention Hearings. The Court entered findings, on the record, and found probable cause. The Court also entered findings that Defendant was a flight risk and denied bond; a written order to follow. In accordance with Rule 5(f), the Court orally admonished the Government of its disclosure obligations under Brady and the consequences of failing to provide such disclosure; a written order to follow. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshals Service. Appearances: Samuel Lucas Delcolle, AUSA; Darrell Bryan, AFPD. (USPO: Mark Zamora) (ERO: Christopher Barrera) (Interpreter: Woody Lewis and Priscilla Muzza Pastor, used) (DUSM: Jaime Torres). (ngb7) [7:25-mj-00653]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Miriam Berenice Aguayo, Federal Public Defender, in case as to Brandon Lerma-Perez, filed. (Aguayo, Miriam) [7:25-mj-00653]
Related: [-]
US ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. Miroslava Alexis Garcia appearing for USA, filed. (Garcia, Miroslava) [7:25-mj-00653]
Related: [-]
4 4 AO 257 Information Sheet as to Brandon Lerma-Perez, filed. (jen7) [7:25-mj-00653]
Related: [-]
5 5 Arrest Warrant issued 4/2/2025; Returned Executed on 4/7/2025 as to Brandon Lerma-Perez.. Document restricted from PACER under privacy policy., filed. (jen7) [7:25-mj-00653]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER for Brandon Lerma-Perez (Signed by Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker) Parties notified. (ngb7) [7:25-mj-00653]
Related: [-]
7 7 Order of Detention Pending Trial as to Brandon Lerma-Perez. (Signed by Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker) Parties notified. (ngb7) [7:25-mj-00653]
Related: [-]
8 8 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Brandon Lerma-Perez. (Signed by Magistrate Judge J Scott Hacker) Parties notified. (ngb7) [7:25-mj-00653]
Related: [-]
9 9 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Brandon Lerma-Perez, filed. [7:25-mj-00653]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
10 10 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Brandon Lerma-Perez, filed. (bao7) [7:25-mj-00653]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
11 11 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Brandon Lerma-Perez (1) count(s) 1, filed. (sr7)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment
12 12 US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet as to Brandon Lerma-Perez, filed. (sr7)
Related: [-]