Florida Southern District Court
Case #: 1:25-cr-20192
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 02, 2025 3:41 AM EDT
Defendant
Marvin Wilton Max Ayala (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Melissa Roca Shaw
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 5:07 AM EDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
1 1 INDICTMENT as to Marvin Wilton Max Ayala (1) count(s) 1. (ogn1) (ogn1).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (5/1/2025) Restricted Unredacted Indictment