Ohio Southern District Court
Case #: 1:25-cr-00043
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 02, 2025 3:34 AM EDT
Defendant
Kyle Rist (1)
Represented By
Herbert Jaime Haas
The Citadel, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Danielle E Margeaux
Doj-Usao
contact info
Kyle J Healey
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 4:52 AM EDT
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
2 2 MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to Kyle Rist. (km) [1:25-mj-00260-SKB]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
3 3 COMPLAINT as to Kyle Rist (1). (km) [1:25-mj-00260-SKB]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER granting2 Motion to Seal Case as to Kyle Rist (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 3/26/2025. (km) [1:25-mj-00260-SKB]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
ORAL MOTION to Unseal Case by USA as to Kyle Rist. (sct) [1:25-mj-00260-SKB]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Kyle Rist. (sct) [1:25-mj-00260-SKB]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz: Initial Appearance on Criminal Complaint as to Kyle Rist held on 4/2/25. Danielle Margeaux appeared for the Government; CJA Counsel Herbert Haas appeared with Defendant Kyle Rist. Complaint unsealed upon oral motion of the United States. Defendant informed of charges and potential penalties. Financial affidavit presented to the Court. The Court appoints CJA Panel Attorney Herbert Haas to represent Defendant in this matter. Defendant informed of his rights and provided copy of charging document. The United States moves for pretrial detention. Detention Hearing set for 4/4/25 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz in Courtroom 708. Related [+]. (sct) [1:25-mj-00260-SKB]
Related: [-] corded By: Courtsmart
Case unsealed as to Kyle Rist (sct) [1:25-mj-00260-SKB]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION for Pretrial Detention by USA as to Kyle Rist. (sct) [1:25-mj-00260-SKB]
Related: [-]
6 6 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Kyle Rist. (sct) [1:25-mj-00260-SKB]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER APPOINTING CJA PANEL ATTORNEY Herbert Haas for Kyle Rist (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 4/2/25. (sct) [1:25-mj-00260-SKB]
Related: [-]
8 8 Due Process Protections Act Order as to Kyle Rist. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 4/2/25. (sct) [1:25-mj-00260-SKB]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Kyle Rist: Detention Hearing set for 4/4/25 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 708 before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 4/2/25. (sct) [1:25-mj-00260-SKB]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz: Detention Hearing as to Kyle Rist held on 4/4/2025. Danielle Margeaux appeared for the Government; CJA Counsel Herbert Haas appeared with Defendant Kyle Rist. The Defendant does not contest detention and waives his right to a detention hearing pending further proceedings. The Court orders Defendant detained pending trial in this matter. Defendant waives preliminary hearing and executes the necessary waiver. Case to proceed to the grand jury. Related [+] (sct) [1:25-mj-00260-SKB]
Related: [-] corded By: CourtSmart
11 11 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Kyle Rist. (sct) [1:25-mj-00260-SKB]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER of Detention as to Kyle Rist (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 4/4/25. (sct) [1:25-mj-00260-SKB]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
15 15 INDICTMENT as to Kyle Rist (1) count(s) 1, 2-17, 18, 19 and Forfeiture Allegation count(s) 20, 21. (sct)
Related: [-]