Texas Western District Court
Case #: 2:25-cr-01019
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 02, 2025 2:43 AM CDT
Defendant
Brandon Lee Pena-Rojas (2)
Represented By
Alan Aguirre-Rivera
Federal Public Defender, Txw Del Rio
contact info
Defendant
Eugene Zapata (1)
Represented By
Raymond Meza, Jr.
Law Office Of Ray Meza, Jr.
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Daisy Gonzalez
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 4:08 AM CDT
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
Arrest of Eugene Zapata, Brandon Lee Pena-Rojas (drda) [2:25-mj-01036-JAC]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
Warrant Returned Executed as to Brandon Lee Pena-Rojas. (drda) [2:25-mj-01036-JAC]
Related: [-]
Warrant Returned Executed as to Eugene Zapata. (drda) [2:25-mj-01036-JAC]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova as to Eugene Zapata, Brandon Lee Pena-Rojas. (drda) [2:25-mj-01036-JAC]
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Joseph A Cordova as to Eugene Zapata. (drda) [2:25-mj-01036-JAC]
Related: [-]
3 3 Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Joseph A Cordova as to Brandon Lee Pena-Rojas. (drda) [2:25-mj-01036-JAC]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
ORAL MOTION to Continue by USA as to Brandon Lee Pena-Rojas. (ccl) [2:25-mj-01036-JAC]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER GRANTING ORAL Motion to Continue as to Brandon Lee Pena-Rojas (2) by Judge Matthew H. Watters. (ccl) [2:25-mj-01036-JAC]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Brandon Lee Pena-Rojas (2) $25,000 SECURED/10% SURETY/2 COSIGNERS-3rd PARTY CUSTODIANS by Judge Matthew H. Watters. (ccl) [2:25-mj-01036-JAC]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION to Continue, ORAL MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to USA as to Eugene Zapata. (drda) [2:25-mj-01036-JAC]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER GRANTING ORAL Motion to Continue as to Eugene Zapata (1); GRANTING ORAL Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond as to Eugene Zapata (1).By Judge Matthew H. Watters. (drda) [2:25-mj-01036-JAC]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER Alan Aguirre-Rivera for Brandon Lee Pena-Rojas. Signed by Judge Matthew H. Watters. (ic) [2:25-mj-01036-JAC]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Raymond Meza, Jr for Eugene Zapata appointed. Signed by Judge Matthew H. Watters. (ic) [2:25-mj-01036-JAC]
Related: [-]
6 6 Proceedings held before Judge Matthew H. Watters:Initial Appearance as to Eugene Zapata held on 4/7/2025 Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing set for 4/10/2025 9:00AM before Judge Joseph A Cordova, Interpreter NOT required as to Eugene Zapata (Court Reporter FTR GOLD - C. LEVRIE.) (drda) [2:25-mj-01036-JAC]
Related: [-]
7 7 Proceedings held before Judge Matthew H. Watters:Initial Appearance as to Brandon Lee Pena-Rojas held on 4/7/2025; ( Preliminary Hearing set for 4/10/2025 09:00 AM before Judge Matthew H. Watters,), Spanish Language Interpreter NOT required as to Brandon Lee Pena-Rojas (Court Reporter FTR GOLD - C. LEVRIE.) (ccl) [2:25-mj-01036-JAC]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
8 8 NOTICE of ASSERTION OF RIGHTS by Brandon Lee Pena-Rojas (Aguirre-Rivera, Alan) [2:25-mj-01036-JAC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
9 9 ORDER as to Brandon Lee Pena-Rojas, Preliminary Hearing RESET for 4/21/2025 09:00 AM before Judge Matthew H. Watters. Signed by Judge Matthew H. Watters. (ic) [2:25-mj-01036-JAC]
Related: [-]
10 10 MOTION to Continue by Eugene Zapata.(Meza, Raymond) [2:25-mj-01036-JAC]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 10, 2025
11 11 ORDER GRANTING10 Motion to Continue as to Eugene Zapata (1) Detention Hearing and Preliminary Hearing RESET for 4/17/2025 09:00 AM before Judge Joseph A Cordova. Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova. (ic) [2:25-mj-01036-JAC]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
12 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT as to Eugene Zapata and Brandon Lee Pena-Rojas. (ic) [2:25-mj-01036-JAC]
Related: [-]
13 13 AMENDED Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 04/02/2025 as to Eugene Zapata. (ic) [2:25-mj-01036-JAC]
Related: [-]
14 14 AMENDED Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 04/02/2025 as to Brandon Lee Pena-Rojas. (ic) [2:25-mj-01036-JAC]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
15 15 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Brandon Lee Pena-Rojas (ic) [2:25-mj-01036-JAC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
16 16 INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Eugene Zapata (1) count(s) 1, Brandon Lee Pena-Rojas (2) count(s) 1. (bot1)
Related: [-] dacted Version
18 18 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Eugene Zapata (bot1)
Related: [-]
19 19 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Brandon Lee Pena-Rojas (bot1)
Related: [-]