California Northern District Court
Judge:Nathanael M Cousins
Case #: 5:25-cv-03669
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
5 5 oth_evt Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 05/01 12:53 PM
Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (pjf, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
4 4 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: IFP Thu 05/01 12:52 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 6/5/2025. (pjf, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Thu 05/01 12:49 PM
NOTICE of Alternate Address, 1422 Charisma Way Brentwood, CA 94513, by Jaylen McDaniel(pjf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis PSP Thu 05/01 12:42 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jaylen McDaniel. (pjf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 05/01 12:32 PM
COMPLAINT against West County Detention Facility Medical. Filed by Jaylen McDaniel. Consent/Declination due by 5/28/2025.(pjf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope