Original Case: 1:22-cv-00675

Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cv-01750
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Case Filed:May 01, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 02, 2025 5:10 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
CHICAGO TRANSIT AUTHORITY
Represented By
Kevin R. Gallardo
CHICAGO TRANSIT AUTHORITY
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
AMALGAMATED TRANSIT UNION, LOCAL 241
Represented By
George A. Luscombe III
DOWD, BLOCH, BENNETT, CERVONE, AUERBACH & YOKICH
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
RUSSIA BROWN
Represented By
Christina Abraham
ABRAHAM LAW & CONSULTING, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 3:20 AM CDT
Thursday, May 01, 2025
1 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Russia Brown by 05/07/2025. Transcript information sheet due by 05/15/2025. Appellant's brief due on or before 06/10/2025 for Russia Brown. [1] [7449886] 25-1750 (CG) [Entered: 05/01/2025 02:54 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 77 pgs Civil Case
Att: 2 2 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice to District Court