Delaware District Court
Judge:Gregory B Williams
Case #: 1:25-cv-00537
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:May 02, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 02, 2025 10:03 AM EDT
Defendant
Sebela Women's Health Inc.
Plaintiff
Accelus, Inc.
Represented By
Natasha M. Songonuga
Archer & Greiner, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
utility Add Attorneys - PHV only Fri 05/09 2:34 PM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Patrick A. Afriyie, Trevor J. Cooney for Accelus, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (cdd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
order SO ORDERED Thu 05/08 8:40 AM
SO ORDERED, re4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Patrick A. Afriyie filed by Accelus, Inc. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 5/8/2025. (lnb)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED Thu 05/08 8:41 AM
SO ORDERED, re5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Trevor J. Cooney filed by Accelus, Inc. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 5/8/2025. (lnb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 05/07 9:24 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Gregory B. Williams. Please include the initials of the Judge (GBW) after the case number on all documents filed. (alb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
6 6 misc -District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 02 Attorneys Credit Card Payment Tue 05/06 9:07 AM
Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for Patrick A. Afriyie and Trevor J. Cooney. ( re4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Patrick A. Afriyie,5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Trevor J. Cooney )( Payment of $ 100, receipt number ADEDC-4679366).(Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
5 5 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 05/05 10:27 AM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Trevor J. Cooney - filed by Accelus, Inc.. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 05/05 10:26 AM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Patrick A. Afriyie - filed by Accelus, Inc.. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1 Mon 05/05 10:17 AM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Accelus, Inc.. (Songonuga, Natasha)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
2 2 misc Magistrate Consent Forms Fri 05/02 9:58 AM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (jfm)
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 05/02 9:57 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Sebela Women's Health Inc. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ADEDC-4676754) - filed by Accelus, Inc.(jfm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Deficiency Notice - No 7.1 Statement Filed Fri 05/02 9:58 AM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE issued by the Court to Plaintiff: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 (b)(1), A party must: (1) file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Counsel is requested to supplement the docket with an appropriate Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (jfm)
Related: [-]
service No Summons Issued Fri 05/02 9:58 AM
No Summons Issued. (jfm)
Related: [-]