New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mark Edward Hall
Case #: 3:25-bk-14662
Case Filed:May 02, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Tona Development Group, LLC
54 Hudson Street Suite 300
Freehold, NJ 07728
Represented By
Albert Anthony Ciardi, III
Ciardi Ciardi & Astin
contact info
Last checked: Monday May 05, 2025 1:26 PM EDT
Creditor
Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company
105 Eisenhower Parkway Attn: Scott Zuber, Esq.
Roseland, NJ 07068
Represented By
Scott A. Zuber
Chiesa Shahinian & Giantomasi PC
contact info
Creditor
Concrete Systems, Inc.
Giordano, Halleran & Ciesla, P.C. 125 Half Mile Road Suite 300
Red Bank, NJ 07701
Represented By
Donald F. Campbell, Jr.
Giordano Halleran & Ciesla, P.C.
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
US Dept of Justice Office of the US Trustee One Newark Center Ste 2100
Newark, NJ 07102
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Sponder
Office Of U.S. Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
17 17 misc Notice of Appearance and Request Tue 05/06 9:21 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Adam Garcia on behalf of Concrete Systems, Inc.. (Garcia, Adam)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Notice of Appearance and Request Tue 05/06 9:20 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Lauren Bielskie on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Bielskie, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
15 15 cmp Complaint Mon 05/05 8:41 PM
Adversary case 25-01194 Complaint by Tona Development Group, LLC against Concrete Systems, Inc.. Fee Amount $ 350.. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Ciardi, Albert)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Certificate of Service Mon 05/05 7:48 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Albert Anthony Ciardi III on behalf of Tona Development Group, LLC. (Ciardi, Albert)
Related: [-] 3 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Tona Development Group, LLC,5 Shorten Time
13 13 answer Objection Mon 05/05 6:56 PM
Objection to Debtor's Motion to Use Cash Collateral and Turnover of Levied Funds Related [+] filed by Donald F. Campbell Jr. on behalf of Concrete Systems, Inc.. (Campbell, Donald)
Related: [-] 3 Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Albert Anthony Ciardi III on behalf of Tona Development Group, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Certification # 3 Exhibit A) filed by Debtor Tona Development Group, LLC
Att: 1 Certification of Adam Garcia, Esq.
Att: 2 Exhibit 1
Att: 3 Exhibit 2
Att: 4 Exhibit 3
Att: 5 Exhibit 4
Att: 6 Exhibit 5
Att: 7 Exhibit 6
Att: 8 Exhibit 7
Att: 9 Exhibit 8
Att: 10 Exhibit 9
12 12 2 pgs order Show Cause Mon 05/05 12:51 PM
Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals, Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Atty Disclosure Statement, Statement of Your Current Monthly Income(122B), List of Equity Security Holders, Statement of Corporate Ownership, Schedules A/B,D,E/F,G,H. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 5/5/2025. Hearing scheduled for 5/29/2025 at 11:00 AM, by phone - Judge Hall: visit www.court-solutions.com or www.njb.uscourts.gov for more information.. (gan)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Notice of Appearance and Request Mon 05/05 10:35 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Scott A. Zuber on behalf of Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company. (Zuber, Scott)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Notice of Appearance and Request Mon 05/05 9:25 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Donald F. Campbell Jr. on behalf of Concrete Systems, Inc.. (Campbell, Donald)
Related: [-]
9 9 court Notice of Hearing (Upload) Mon 05/05 9:14 AM
Notice of Hearing for: STATUS CONFERENCE. Related [+]. The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney, Trustee, and US Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 6/26/2025 at 02:00 PM, MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton.. (mjb)
Related: [-] 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Albert Anthony Ciardi III on behalf of Tona Development Group, LLC. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 09/2/2025. (Attachments: # 1 Corporate Resolution # 2 List of 20 Largest Creditors # 3 Verification of Creditor Matrix) filed by Debtor Tona Development Group, LLC
8 8 misc Notice of Appearance and Request Mon 05/05 8:23 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Jeffrey M. Sponder on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Sponder, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
7 7 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Mon 05/05 8:23 AM
Meeting of Creditors - Chapter 11. 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/5/2025 at 01:00 PM at Telephonic. Proofs of Claim due by 7/11/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/29/2025. (llb)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 04, 2025
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Mon 05/05 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/04/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
5 5 order Shorten Time Fri 05/02 4:12 PM
Order Regarding Application For Expedited Consideration Of First Day Matters Related [+] Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 5/2/2025. Hearing scheduled for 5/6/2025 at 12:00 PM, by phone - Judge Hall: visit www.court-solutions.com or www.njb.uscourts.gov for more information.. (mjb)
Related: [-] 3 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Tona Development Group, LLC
4 4 utility Case Assigned Fri 05/02 3:21 PM
Case Assignment. Judge Mark Edward Hall added to the case. (nrf)
Related: [-]
3 3 10 pgs motion Use Cash Collateral Fri 05/02 1:56 PM
Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Albert Anthony Ciardi III on behalf of Tona Development Group, LLC.. (Ciardi, Albert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Certification
Att: 3 Exhibit A
2 2 3 pgs motion Expedited Consideration of First Day Matters (For Ch. 11 Cases Only) Fri 05/02 1:53 PM
Application for Expedited Consideration of First Day Matters Filed by Albert Anthony Ciardi III on behalf of Tona Development Group, LLC. (Ciardi, Albert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
1 1 4 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Fri 05/02 11:12 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Albert Anthony Ciardi III on behalf of Tona Development Group, LLC. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 09/2/2025. (Ciardi, Albert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Corporate Resolution
Att: 2 2 pgs List of 20 Largest Creditors
Att: 3 Verification of Creditor Matrix
crditcrd Credit Card/Debit Card Receipt Fri 05/02 11:12 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 25-14662 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A48103665, fee amount $ 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1