Mississippi Southern District Court
Judge:Carlton W Reeves
Referred: Andrew S Harris
Case #: 3:25-cv-00310
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:May 01, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 02, 2025 11:13 AM CDT
Defendant
Concert Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant
Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.
Plaintiff
Cornerstone Inspections LLC
Represented By
Michael Verdier Cory, Jr.
Danks, Miller & Cory
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, May 05, 2025
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 05/05 12:05 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cornerstone Inspections LLC. Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. served on 5/5/2025, answer due 5/27/2025. (Cory, Michael)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 04, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Sun 05/04 7:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lizbeth Jimena Velasquez on behalf of Cornerstone Inspections LLC (Velasquez, Lizbeth)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 05/02 5:22 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cornerstone Inspections LLC (Cory, Michael)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 05/02 5:05 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cornerstone Inspections LLC. Concert Specialty Insurance Company served on 5/2/2025, answer due 5/23/2025. (Cory, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 05/02 8:48 AM
Summons Issued as to Concert Specialty Insurance Company, Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. (LAT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 05/02 8:39 AM
COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DECLARATORY RELIEF with JURY DEMAND against Concert Specialty Insurance Company, Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMSSDC-5676092), filed by Cornerstone Inspections LLC.(LAT) Modified on 5/2/2025 to reflect correct file date (LAT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet