Mississippi Southern District Court
Judge:Daniel P Jordan, III
Referred: Andrew S Harris
Case #: 3:25-cv-00311
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Case Filed:May 01, 2025
Case in other court:Circuit Court of Lauderdale County, Mississippi, 38CI1:25-cv-37-rb
Last checked: Friday May 02, 2025 11:13 AM CDT
Defendant
Allison Casey
Defendant
Georgia-Pacific LLC
Represented By
Jonathan H. Still
Butler Snow Llp-Ridgeland
contact info
Defendant
John and Jane Does 1-10
Defendant
Koch Industries, Inc.
Plaintiff
Darren Johnson
Represented By
Ashley Hendricks Duck
Chhabra & Gibbs, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
5 5 respoth Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Thu 05/08 4:13 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Georgia-Pacific LLC (Still, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Rule 16(a) Initial Order Thu 05/08 9:08 AM
Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 7/8/2025 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrew S. Harris. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e mail to harris_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/02 1:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Gabrie Mansoor, III on behalf of Georgia-Pacific LLC (Mansoor, III, Anthony)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/02 1:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Lott Warren on behalf of Georgia-Pacific LLC (Warren, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 05/02 8:55 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Georgia-Pacific LLC from Circuit Court of Lauderdale County, Mississippi, case number 38CI1:25-cv-37-rb. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMSSDC-5676146) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (TH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-Copies of all process, pleadings, etc svd upon Georgia Pac,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2-State Court Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3-State Court Record,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4-Declaration of Mark Berry,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet