Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Patrick M Hunt
Case #: 0:25-cv-60866
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:May 02, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 02, 2025 1:07 PM EDT
Defendant
EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC
Defendant
EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC
Defendant
TransUnion, LLC
Plaintiff
Garland Waddell King
1311 NW 43rd Avenue Apt 203
Lauderhill, FL 33313


Docket last updated: 67 minutes ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
25 25 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 05/09 2:32 PM
Plaintiff's Emergency MOTION For Immediate Ruling Based on Verified Record and Judicial Notice by Garland Waddell King. (gqa)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Amend/Correct Fri 05/09 2:28 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to Amend Verified Complaint by Garland Waddell King. Responses due by 5/23/2025. (gqa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
23 23 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Tue 05/06 4:22 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Garland Waddell King. TransUnion, LLC served on 5/6/2025, response/answer due 5/27/2025. (ar24)
Related: [-]
22 22 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Tue 05/06 2:35 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Garland Waddell King. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC served on 5/6/2025, response/answer due 5/27/2025. (ar24)
Related: [-]
21 21 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Tue 05/06 2:34 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Garland Waddell King. EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC served on 5/6/2025, response/answer due 5/27/2025. (ar24)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
20 20 notice Notice (Other) Fri 05/02 3:27 PM
Flag NOTICE to Court: Verified Complaint, Informational Theft, Unauthorized Access by Garland Waddell King (nan)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Summary Judgment Fri 05/02 3:26 PM
MOTION for Entry of Final Summary Judgment by Garland Waddell King. Responses due by 5/16/2025. (nan)
Related: [-]
18 18 respoth Affidavit /in Opposition/in Support (NOT USED FOR MOTIONS) Fri 05/02 3:24 PM
Verified Master Declaration Regarding Unauthorized Invasion of Protected Verified Complaint re1 Complaint, by Garland Waddell King. (nan)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Declaratory Judgment Fri 05/02 3:21 PM
MOTION for Immediate Declaratory Relief Based on Verified Constitutional and Statutory Violations by Garland Waddell King. (nan)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Strike Fri 05/02 3:20 PM
MOTION to Strike Future Defenses Based on Procedural Default and Unrebutted Record by Garland Waddell King. Responses due by 5/16/2025. (nan)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Hearing Fri 05/02 3:18 PM
Emergency MOTION to Enforce Emergency Hearing within 24-48 Hours by Garland Waddell King. (nan)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 05/02 3:17 PM
MOTION Emergency Motion to Seal Final Judgment with Prejudice by Garland Waddell King. (nan)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Summary Judgment Fri 05/02 3:08 PM
Emergency MOTION for Final Summary Judgment on Damages by Garland Waddell King. Responses due by 5/16/2025. (nan)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 05/02 3:07 PM
MOTION for Execution of Final Judgment and Enforcement of Collection by Garland Waddell King. (nan)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Strike Fri 05/02 3:06 PM
MOTION to Strike any Opposition Filed by Defendants by Garland Waddell King. Responses due by 5/16/2025. (nan)
Related: [-]
10 10 respoth Affidavit /in Opposition/in Support (NOT USED FOR MOTIONS) Fri 05/02 3:05 PM
Master Declaration in Support of Verified Complaint and Filings #1- #6 re1 Complaint, by Garland Waddell King. (nan)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Fri 05/02 2:57 PM
NOTICE Of Submission in Lieu of Oral Argument - Pro se Status and Request for Relaxation of Technicalities by Garland Waddell King (nan)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Temporary Restraining Order Preliminary Injunction Summary Judgment Fri 05/02 2:54 PM
Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ( Responses due by 5/16/2025.), MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Final Summary Judgment ( Responses due by 5/16/2025.) by Garland Waddell King. (nan) (nan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (5/2/2025) Text of Proposed Order
7 7 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Fri 05/02 2:53 PM
ORDER REGARDING MAGISTRATE JUDGE JURISDICTION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 5/2/2025. See attached document for full details. (hhr)
Related: [-]
6 6 5 pgs misc Memorandum Fri 05/02 2:53 PM
MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Verified Complaint, Emergency Motion, and Request for Final Summary Judgment re1 Complaint, by Garland Waddell King. (nan)
Related: [-]
5 5 respoth Affidavit /in Opposition/in Support (NOT USED FOR MOTIONS) Fri 05/02 2:51 PM
Verified AFFIDAVIT in Support of Verified Complaint in Support re1 Complaint, by Garland Waddell King. (nan)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 05/02 12:45 PM
Summons Issued as to EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC, TransUnion, LLC. (nan)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Clerk's Receipt (combines Filing Fee and Partial Filing Fee) Fri 05/02 12:44 PM
Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 5/2/2025 in the amount of $ 405.00, receipt number 20109 (nan)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Judge Assignment Fri 05/02 12:38 PM
Judge Assignment to Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt (nan)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 05/02 12:34 PM
EMERGENCY COMPLAINT against EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC, TransUnion, LLC. Filing fees $ 405.00, filed by Garland Waddell King.(nan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibits,
Att: 3 Table of Contents