Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Matthew J Kacsmaryk
Referred: Lee Ann Reno
Case #: 2:25-cv-00097
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:May 02, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
6 6 misc Public Correspondence Received Thu 05/08 11:07 AM
Public correspondence filed, deputy clerk response attached, received from Tevin Darrell Neighbors. (awc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 clerk's response letter
Monday, May 05, 2025
5 5 2 pgs order Order Consolidating Cases Mon 05/05 3:46 PM
ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES: Member case(s) 2:25-cv-98 consolidated with lead case 2:25-cv-97. Israel A Barajas Espinosa added to case pursuant to consolidation. Neighbors shall complete and file an amended complaint on the form provided by the Clerk by June 5, 2025. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 5/5/2025) (ars)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Amended complaint form
misc Order Receipt Mon 05/05 3:47 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Mon May 5 15:47:23 CDT 2025 (crt)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
4 4 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 05/02 11:30 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Tevin Darrell Neighbors. (awc)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Complaint Fri 05/02 11:26 AM
COMPLAINT against Adam R Gonzales, Daniel V Pacheco, Carl M Schiwart filed by Tevin Darrell Neighbors. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (awc)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party Fri 05/02 11:23 AM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (awc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 General Order Concerning Litigation
1 1 qcref Kacsmaryk Fri 05/02 11:22 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Reno (see Special Order 3). No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the[LINK:national] and[LINK:circuit] indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Reno). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (awc)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Fri 05/02 11:31 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. (Copy of first page of file-marked complaint also mailed.) Fri May 2 11:31:01 CDT 2025 (crt)
Related: [-]